EP1520300 - LOW TEMPERATURE, BUMP-BONDED RADIATION IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oy Ajat Ltd. Tietotie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VUORELA, Mikko, Ilmari Ajat Oy Ltd., Metsanneidonkuja 10 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | [2008/27] |
Former [2005/14] | 01 /
VUORELA, Mikko, Ilman Ajat Oy Ltd., Metsanneidonkuja 10 FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Kärkkäinen, Veli-Matti, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy AB Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Kärkkäinen, Veli-Matti, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03712573.9 | 12.03.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003IB01510 | Priority number, date | US20020364249P | 13.03.2002 Original published format: US 364249 P | US20020126254 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 126254 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03077319 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1520300 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1520300 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/14661 (EP,US);
H01L27/14634 (EP,US);
H01L27/14636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TIEFTEMPERATUR-STRAHLUNGSBILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG MIT HÖCKER-BONDVERBINDUNG | [2005/14] | English: | LOW TEMPERATURE, BUMP-BONDED RADIATION IMAGING DEVICE | [2005/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE A RAYONNEMENT A LIAISON A BOSSE ET A FAIBLE TEMPERATURE | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.01.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | 18.01.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.01.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   18.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | TR | 09.07.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | IE | 12.03.2009 | LU | 12.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
LU | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
LU | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | BG | 09.10.2008 | |
PT | 09.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5952646 (SPARTIOTIS KONSTANTINOS EVANGE [GR], et al) [YD] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 3, line 58 * * claims 1-6,12 *; | [YD]DE10003665 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 25 *; | [A]EP1148548 (ADVANCED INTERCONNECT TECH LTD [HK]) [A] 1,5-15 * abstract ** column 9, line 10 - line 20 * |