EP1560843 - NOVEL VARIANTS OF RANKL PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xencor, Inc. 111 W. Lemon Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | [2005/48] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Xencor 111 W. Lemon Avenue Monrovia, CA 91016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESJARLAIS, John, R. 2096 Crary Street Pasadena, CA 91104 / US | 02 /
HUBERT, Rene, S. 1644 Occidental Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90026 / US | 03 /
YAZAL, Jamal, El 6731 Florence Place Alta Loma, CA 91701 / US | 04 /
MARSHALL, Shannon, Alicia 825 Lincoln Way, 106 San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
DESJARLAIS, John, R. 2096 Crary Street Pasadena, CA 91104 / US | ||
02 /
HUBERT, Rene, S. 1644 Occidental Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90026 / US | |||
03 /
YAZAL, Jamal, El 6731 Florence Place Alta Loma, CA 91701 / US | |||
04 /
MARSHALL, Shannon, Alicia 825 Lincoln Way, #106 San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03713210.7 | 06.01.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US00393 | Priority number, date | US20020345805P | 04.01.2002 Original published format: US 345805 P | US20020373453P | 17.04.2002 Original published format: US 373453 P | US20020374035P | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 374035 P | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03059281 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1560843 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, C12N5/00, A61K38/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/70575 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Title | German: | NEUE VARIANTEN VON RANKL-PROTEIN | [2005/32] | English: | NOVEL VARIANTS OF RANKL PROTEIN | [2005/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX VARIANTS DE PROTEINES RANKL | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 14.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/08] | Request for further processing for: | 31.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 31.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0015807 (M & E BIOTECH A S [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,19-24 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 5 * * page 29, line 7 - line 19 * * page 29, line 20 - page 36, line 11 * * page 54, line 10 - page 61, line 13 * * claims 17-19,32,53-56 * [Y] 1-3,8,19-26; | [XY]WO0125277 (MAXYGEN APS [DK]) [X] 1-3,8,19-26 * abstract * * page 12, line 3 - page 13, line 6 * * page 13, line 14 - page 14, line 12 * * page 14, line 15 - line 23 * * page 25, line 1 - page 26, line 14 * * page 26, line 17 - page 27, line 33 * * page 29, line 7 - page 30, line 22 * * claims 21,22 * [Y] 1-3,8,19-26; | [XY]WO0142298 (KORNBLUTH RICHARD S [US]) [X] 1,3,19-24 * abstract * * page 1, line 8 - line 15 * * page 3, line 11 - page 6, line 9 * * page 29, line 1 * [Y] 1-3,8,19-26; | [Y]WO0164889 (XENCOR INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,8,19-26 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 32, paragraphs 1,2 *; | [DXY] - LACEY D L ET AL, "Osteoprotegerin ligand is a cytokine that regulates osteoclast differentiation and activation", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (19980417), vol. 93, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 165 - 176, XP002125264 [DX] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-3,8,19-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81569-X | [XY] - YASUDA H ET AL, "Osteoclast differentiation factor is a ligand for osteoprotegerin/osteoclastogenesis -inhibitory factor and is identical to TRANCE/RANKL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19980331), no. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3597 - 3602, XP002076248 [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-3,8,19-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.7.3597 | [T] - STEED P M ET AL, "Inactivation of TNF signaling by rationally designed dominant-negative TNF variants", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20030926), vol. 301, no. 5641, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1895 - 1898, XP002320440 [T] 1-3,8,19-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1081297 | International search | [X]US6242213 |