EP1485775 - RF POINT OF SALE AND DELIVERY METHOD AND SYSTEM USING COMMUNICATION WITH REMOTE COMPUTER AND HAVING FEATURES TO READ A LARGE NUMBER OF RF TAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMEGA CORPORATION 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US | [2004/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEARING, Michael 5200 County Z Spring Green, WI 53588 / US | 02 /
VIDUGIRIS, Gediminas 5719 Longford Terrace Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US | 03 /
LINTON, William, A. 5846 Persimmon Street Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US | 04 /
LINTON, John 1338 Holly Street, Apt. 1 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 05 /
KRUEGER, Julia, E. 3676 Saddle Ridge Road Deerfield, Wisconsin 53531 / US | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/51] | 01 /
DEARING, Michael 5200 County Z Spring Green, WI 53588 / US | ||
02 /
VIDUGIRIS, Gediminas 5719 Longford Terrace Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US | Representative(s) | Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03713485.5 | 18.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003US04653 | Priority number, date | US20020080330 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: US 80330 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03073201 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1485775 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/10336 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0603 (EP,KR,US);
G07F9/026 (EP,KR,US);
G07G1/0045 (EP,KR,US);
G07G1/009 (EP,US);
H04W4/35 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HF-VERKAUF.-UND ABLIEFERVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM MIT KOMMUNIKATION MIT FERNCOMPUTER UND MIT MERKMALEN ZUM LESEN EINER GROSSEN ANZAHL VON RF-TAGS | [2004/51] | English: | RF POINT OF SALE AND DELIVERY METHOD AND SYSTEM USING COMMUNICATION WITH REMOTE COMPUTER AND HAVING FEATURES TO READ A LARGE NUMBER OF RF TAGS | [2004/51] | French: | POINT DE VENTE RF ET SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION UTILISANT LA TELEMATIQUE ET AYANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES DE LECTURE D'UN GRAND NOMBRE D'ETIQUETTES | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 31.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5621199 (CALARI UMBERTO [IT], et al) [X] 36,37,43-46,50 * abstract * * column 2 *[A] 38-42,47-49; | [X]WO9945495 (TROLLEY SCAN PROPRIETARY LIMIT [ZA], et al) [X] 51-56 * abstract * * page 4 - page 11 *; | [X]US5959568 (WOOLLEY LOUIS A [US]) [X] 1-14,51-59,65-71 * abstract * * column 1 - column 14 *; | [X]DE29912346U (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-14,36,38-43,50,60-71 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001000019 (BOWERS JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1-14,51-59,65-71 * abstract * * page 1 - page 3 *; | [XA]WO0155931 (TRAFFICOP INC [US]) [X] 15-35 * abstract * * page 5 - page 8 * [A] 1-14,51-59,65-71; | [PX]WO0235432 (PROMEGA CORP [US]) [PX] 1-14,51-59,65-71 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2002183882 (DEARING MICHAEL [US], et al) [PX] 1-71 * the whole document *; | [L]US2003034390 (LINTON WILLIAM A [US], et al) [L] 1-35,51-59,65-71 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4616694 (HSIEH SHIH-YUNG [US]); | [Y]US4866661 (DE PRINS MAURITS L [BE]); | [Y]US5285041 (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US]); | [Y]US5822714 (CATO ROBERT THOMAS [US]); | [X]US6057756 (ENGELLENNER THOMAS J [US]) |