EP1476111 - A DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH PARTIAL TEXTURE, COLOR OR PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGEE, Luke Robinson 6119 Fairway Drive Cincinnati, OH 45212 / US | 02 /
GLACKIN, III, George, Bartol 320 Pleasant Hill Drive Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | 03 /
HOSMER, Christopher, John 1735 Commonwealth Avenue Brighton MA 02135 / US | 04 /
KORN, Naomi, Shoshana 295 Harvard St., 506 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 05 /
WILSON, James, Douglas 343 Prospect Street Norwood, MA 02062 / US | 06 /
BATES, Mark, Christopher 57 Burgess Avenue Westwood, MA 02090 / US | 07 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21 65510 Idstein / DE | 08 /
THURNAY, Eva, Susanne, Dominique Peter Bied Str. 7 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 09 /
MUELLER, Joerg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | 10 /
COSTELLO, John, Carl 46 Dover Road Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | 11 /
SULLIVAN, Ann, Marie 211 Temple Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | 12 /
FLENDER, Gregg, Allen 29 Springs Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 13 /
ROE, Donald, Carroll 6324 Emberwood Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 14 /
KLINE, Mark, James 6318 Alert New London Road Okeana, OH 45053 / US | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
MAGEE, Luke Robinson 2847 Minto Avenue Apt. B Cin cinnati, OH 45208 / US | ||
02 /
GLACKIN, III, George, Bartol 320 Pleasant Hill Drive Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | |||
03 /
HOSMER, Christopher, John 1735 Commonwealth Avenue Brighton MA 02135 / US | |||
04 /
KORN, Naomi, Shoshana 295 Harvard St., 506 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
WILSON, James, Douglas 343 Prospect Street Norwood, MA 02062 / US | |||
06 /
BATES, Mark, Christopher 57 Burgess Avenue Westwood, MA 02090 / US | |||
07 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21 65510 Idstein / DE | |||
08 /
THURNAY, Eva, Susanne, Dominique Peter Bied Str. 7 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | |||
09 /
MUELLER, Joerg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | |||
10 /
COSTELLO, John, Carl 46 Dover Road Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | |||
11 /
SULLIVAN, Ann, Marie 211 Temple Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | |||
12 /
FLENDER, Gregg, Allen 29 Springs Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
13 /
ROE, Donald, Carroll 6324 Emberwood Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | |||
14 /
KLINE, Mark, James 6318 Alert New London Road Okeana, OH 45053 / US | |||
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
MAGEE, Luke Robinson 2847 Minto Avenue Apt. B Cin cinnati, OH 45208 / US | ||
02 /
GLACKIN, III, George, Bartol 320 Pleasant Hill Drive Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | |||
03 /
HOSMER, Christopher, John 1735 Commonwealth Avenue Brighton MA 02135 / US | |||
04 /
KORN, Naomi, Shoshana 295 Harvard St., 506 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
WILSON, James, Douglas 78 Kilsyth Rd., 8 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | |||
06 /
BATES, Mark, Christopher 57 Burgess Avenue Westwood, MA 02090 / US | |||
07 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21 65510 Idstein / DE | |||
08 /
THURNAY, Eva, Susanne, Dominique Peter Bied Str. 7 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | |||
09 /
MUELLER, Joerg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | |||
10 /
COSTELLO, John, Carl 46 Dover Road Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | |||
11 /
SULLIVAN, Ann, Marie 211 Temple Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | |||
12 /
FLENDER, Gregg, Allen 29 Springs Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
13 /
ROE, Donald, Carroll 6324 Emberwood Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | |||
14 /
KLINE, Mark, James 6318 Alert New London Road Okeana, OH 45053 / US | |||
Former [2004/47] | 01 /
MAGEE, Luke Robinson 2847 Minto Avenue Apt. B Cin cinnati, OH 45208 / US | ||
02 /
GLACKIN, III, George, Bartol 320 Pleasant Hill Drive Wyoming, OH 45215 / US | |||
03 /
HOSMER, Christopher, John 375 Commonwealth Avenue Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
04 /
KORN, Naomi, Shoshana 295 Harvard St., 506 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
WILSON, James, Douglas 78 Kilsyth Rd., 8 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | |||
06 /
BATES, Mark, Christopher 57 Burgess Avenue Westwood, MA 02090 / US | |||
07 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21 65510 Idstein / DE | |||
08 /
THURNAY, Eva, Susanne, Dominique Peter Bied Str. 7 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | |||
09 /
MUELLER, Joerg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | |||
10 /
COSTELLO, John, Carl 46 Dover Road Wellesley, MA 02482 / US | |||
11 /
SULLIVAN, Ann, Marie 211 Temple Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | |||
12 /
FLENDER, Gregg, Allen 29 Springs Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
13 /
ROE, Donald, Carroll 6324 Emberwood Court West Chester, OH 45069 / US | |||
14 /
KLINE, Mark, James 6318 Alert New London Road Okeana, OH 45053 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 03713523.3 | 15.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US04888 | Priority number, date | US20020079184 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: US 79184 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03070136 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1476111 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476111 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F13/84, A61F13/56 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
A61F13/84 (EP,US);
A61F13/49 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/495 (EP,US);
A61F13/51394 (US);
A61F13/56 (KR);
A61F13/5622 (US);
A61F13/5633 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
A61F13/51496 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT TEILWEISER TEXTUR, EINFÄRBUNG ODER TEILWEISEM MUSTER | [2004/47] | English: | A DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH PARTIAL TEXTURE, COLOR OR PATTERN | [2004/47] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT JETABLE CON U POUR PERMETTRE UN CHANGE A L'INTUITION ET DE MANIERE AISEE | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06125384.5 / EP1854441 | EP09177878.7 Application withdrawn : 10.11.2010 | EP09177879.5 / EP2165687 | EP10165229.5 / EP2241297 | EP10165230.3 / EP2248495 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2011
04.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 02
16.02.2011
28.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | 03
30.03.2011
07.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Kühn, Ralph, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2011
04.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
02
16.02.2011
28.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | |||
03
30.03.2011
07.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-City Ehime / JP Opponent's representative Kühn, Ralph, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2011
04.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
02
16.02.2011
28.02.2011
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Hammond, Andrew David, et al, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | |||
Former [2011/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2011
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert, et al, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 11.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.09.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/52] | Appeal following opposition | 19.06.2013 | Appeal received No. T1431/13 | 13.09.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | HU | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | IE | 15.02.2011 | LU | 15.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 15.02.2011 | ||
LU | 15.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
SE | 30.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4351340 (MCLEOD SYBLE A) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 49 - line 68; figure 9 *; | [X]US4397646 (DANIELS ROBERT C, et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 1, line 66 - line 68; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4581772 (SMITH ALICE G [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 33 - line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4615695 (COOPER ROSANNA M [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 21 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]DE20020178U (RIEMER GERARDA [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document * |