EP1483628 - FULL PHASE SHIFTING MASK IN DAMASCENE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synopsys, Inc. 700 East Middlefield Road Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Numerical Technologies, Inc. 700 E. Middlefield Road Mountain View, California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERRAT, Christophe 2061 Rockhurst Court Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03713753.6 | 27.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US06041 | Priority number, date | US20020363674P | 11.03.2002 Original published format: US 363674 P | US20020295575 | 14.11.2002 Original published format: US 295575 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079117 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483628 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483628 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00, G03F9/00, G03C5/00 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G03F1/30 (EP,US);
G03F9/00 (KR);
G03F1/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | G03F9/00, G03C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | VOLLPHASENVERSCHIEBUNGSMASKE IN EINEM DAMASCENE-PROZESS | [2004/50] | English: | FULL PHASE SHIFTING MASK IN DAMASCENE PROCESS | [2004/50] | French: | MASQUE A DEPHASAGE COMPLET DANS PROCEDE DE DAMASQUINAGE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 15.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2003 | AT | 21.03.2012 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | IT | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
IT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 22.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6013397 (LIN CHIN-LUNG [TW], et al) [A] 3,6 * column 3, lines 1-6; figure 3a *; | [XY]WO0025181 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8-13 * pages 18-19; figure 7 * * page 34, lines 6-19; figure 18 * [Y] 3-7; | [Y]WO0203140 (NUMERICAL TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 3-7 * page 8, lines 19-32 * * page 9, lines 1-5; figures 7-9 * * page 18, lines 3,4 * * page 15, lines 25-32 * * page 16, lines 1-6; figure 16 * * page 9, lines 28,29 *; | [A]US2002024139 (CHAN SIMON S [US], et al) [A] 8,9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 1 *; | [PXY]US6518180 (FUKUDA HIROSHI [JP]) [PX] 1,2,8-13 * column 11, lines 1-26; figure 7 * * column 19, lines 45-64; figure 18 *[PY] 3-7 | International search | [Y]US5858580 (WANG YAO-TING [US], et al); | [Y]US5807649 (LIEBMANN LARS W [US], et al) |