EP1601902 - VESSEL DIAPHRAGM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enpress L.L.C. 34495 Melinz Parkway Eastlake OH 44095 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Polymer & Steel Technologies Holding Company, LLC 34355 Vokes Drive Eastlake, OH 44095-4033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Thomas, G. 6267 Marteney Avenue Kent, OH 44240 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/49] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03713899.7 | 05.03.2003 | [2005/49] | WO2003US06651 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004079244 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601902 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/04, B65D90/10, F15B1/10, F15B1/14 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
F15B1/165 (EP);
F16L55/053 (EP);
F15B2201/205 (EP);
F15B2201/3151 (EP);
F15B2201/3152 (EP);
F15B2201/4053 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | F16L55/04, B65D90/10 | ||
Former IPC [2005/49] | F16L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERDIAPHRAGMA UND VERFAHREN | [2005/49] | English: | VESSEL DIAPHRAGM AND METHOD | [2005/49] | French: | DIAPHRAGME DE CUVE ET PROCEDE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 20.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US3931834 (CAILLET EUGENE) [X] 10,12-14 * column 1, lines 29-45; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 36-61 * [A] 11,15 [I] 1-5; | [XA]US5368073 (MURPHY JAMES C [US]) [X] 10-15 * column 2, lines 58-59; figure 2 * * column 3, lines 13-20, 29-30, 34-39, 41, 44, 54-57 * * page 4, lines 1-4 *[A] 1 | International search | [X]US3625256 ; | [X]US5551590 ; | [X]US4784181 ; | [Y]US4344645 ; | [A]US3802464 ; | [A]US4595037 |