EP1518004 - USE OF SEPARATION GAS IN CONTINUOUS HOT DIP METAL FINISHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAKOWSKI, Walter Sanddornstrasse 42 47269 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
BRISBERGER, Rolf Am Tapp 17 47661 Issum / DE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Klüppel, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03714895.4 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003EP03219 | Priority number, date | DE2002129203 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10229203 | DE2002133343 | 23.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10233343 | [2005/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003250 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518004 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518004 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/02, C23C2/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
C23C2/00 (EP,US);
C23C2/00344 (EP,US);
C23C2/004 (EP,US);
C23C2/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRENNGASEINSATZ BEI DER KONTINUIERLICHEN SCHMELZTAUCHVEREDELUNG | [2005/13] | English: | USE OF SEPARATION GAS IN CONTINUOUS HOT DIP METAL FINISHING | [2005/13] | French: | UTILISATION DE GAZ DE SEPARATION LORS DE LA FINITION EN CONTINUE DE METAUX PAR IMMERSION A CHAUD | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.12.2007 | CZ | 26.12.2007 | DK | 26.12.2007 | EE | 26.12.2007 | IE | 26.12.2007 | RO | 26.12.2007 | SK | 26.12.2007 | BG | 26.03.2008 | GR | 27.03.2008 | CH | 31.03.2008 | LI | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 26.05.2008 | HU | 27.06.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 26.12.2007 | |
CZ | 26.12.2007 | ||
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
DK | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11279730 ; | [X]JPH07180014 ; | [A]DE617024 (KARL DAEVES DR ING) [A] 4 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3738861 (SCIFFER J, et al) [A] 4* column 5, line 28 - line 35; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2050432 (BOC LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 84 - line 92 * * page 2, line 10 - line 13; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4862825 (FONTAINE PAUL P [DE]) [A] 4 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 17 *; | [A]US6224692 (CANTACUZENE SERBAN [FR]) [A] 2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11279730 A 19991012 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07180014 A 19950718 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |