EP1493797 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 14-1, Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Steel Chemical Co., Ltd. 21-11, Nishi-gotanda 7-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | |||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Steel Chemical Co., Ltd. 21-11, Nishi-gotanda 7-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | |||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Steel Chemical Co., Ltd. 21-11, Nishi-gotanda 7-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJI, Taishi, @Pioneer Corporation, @Corp. R&D Lab. 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
MIYAZAKI, Hiroshi, @Nippon Steel Chemical Co. Ltd. R&D Laboratories 46-80, Sakinohama Oaza Nakabaru Tobata-ku, Ki / JP | [2012/46] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
TSUJI, Taishi, Pioneer Corporation, Corp. R&D Lab. 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAZAKI, Hiroshi, Nippon Steel Chemical Co. Ltd. R&D Laboratories, 46-80, Sakinohama, Oaza Nakabaru Tobata-ku, Ki / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03715461.4 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP03776 | Priority number, date | JP20020096908 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002096908 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03083009 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493797 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493797 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00, C09K11/06 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/321 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1037 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1048 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1092 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,US);
C09K2211/186 (EP,US);
C09K2211/188 (EP,US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/30 (EP,US);
H10K85/341 (EP,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
H10K85/615 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
H10K85/649 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | C09K11/06, H05B33/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2012/46] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT | [2005/01] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENCE ELEMENT | [2005/01] | French: | ELEMENT ELECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2004 | Translation filed | 24.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 03.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.11.2012 | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/37] | NL | 14.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5141671 (BRYAN PHILIP S [US], et al); | [X]US5150006 (VAN SLYKE STEVEN A [US], et al); | [A]EP0726304 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) | International search | [A]JP2001271063 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [A]JP2001326080 (PIONEER TOHOKU CORP) |