EP1493811 - NOVEL PROMOTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAOKA, Tetsuya 873-2, Junna, Ikawadanicho, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2124 / JP | 02 /
YOKOMIZO, Satoru 201, Shihaitsu, 1630, Higashifutami, Futamicho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 674-0092 / JP | 03 /
MIYAMOTO, Kenji, 101, Nikkanhaimu Dai8 3-13, Hiyoshihoncho 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-0062 / JP | 04 /
OSAKADA, Fumio 17-7, Daianjihigashimachi Okayama-shi, Okayama 700-0063 / JP | 05 /
MATSUMOTO, Keiji 11-33, Omoricho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8023 / JP | 06 /
TAKAGI, Masamichi 31-10, Sakaecho 1-chome Fuchu-shi, Tokyo 183-0051 / JP | 07 /
OTA, Akinori 57-2, Puraza Saitama-shi, Saitama 331-0063 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03715776.5 | 08.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP04426 | Priority number, date | JP20020105240 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002105240 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03085111 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493811 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N1/19, C12P7/62, C12R1/72 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/4716 (EP,US);
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12N9/1025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | C12N15/11, C12N1/19, C12P7/62, // C12N1:19, C12R1:72 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE PROMOTOREN | [2005/01] | English: | NOVEL PROMOTERS | [2005/01] | French: | NOUVEAUX PROMOTEURS | [2005/01] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | Translation filed | 01.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 01.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PARK S M ET AL, "Galactose-inducible expression systems in Candida maltosa using promoters of newly-isolated GAL1 and GAL1 genes", YEAST, CHICHESTER, SUSSEX, GB, (1997), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0749-503X, pages 21 - 29, XP002093562 [A] 1-25 * page 24, column R, paragraph 2; figures 2,3 * * page 27, column R, paragraph 3 - page 28, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(199701)13:1<21::AID-YEA58>3.3.CO;2-C | International search | [X] - LOSBERGER C. ET AL., "Sequence of the candida albicans gene encoding actin", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19891125), vol. 17, no. 22, page 9488, XP002969552 | [X] - GIL-NAVARRO I. ET AL., "The glycolytic enzyme glyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase of candida albicans is a surface antigen", J. BACTERIOL., (199708), vol. 179, no. 16, pages 4992 - 4999, XP002917386 | [X] - MONK B.C. ET AL., "Cloning and characterization of the plasma membrane H(+)-ATPase from candida albicans", J. BACTERIOL., (199111), vol. 173, no. 21, pages 6826 - 6836, XP002183989 | [X] - SUNDSTROM P. ET AL., "Sequence analysis and expression of the two genes for elongation factor 1 alpha from the dimorphic yeast candida albicans", J. BACTERIOL., (199004), vol. 172, no. 4, pages 2036 - 2045, XP002969553 | [Y] - FUKUI T. ET AL., "Co-expression of polyhydroxyalkanoate synthase and (R)-enoyl-CoA hydratase genes of Aeromonas caviae establishes copolyester biosynthesis pathway in escherichia coli", FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (19990101), vol. 170, no. 1, pages 69 - 75, XP002945005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1097(98)00526-6 | [A] - MUTOH E. ET AL., "A gene coding for a ribosomal protein L41 in cycloheximide-resistant ribosomes has a promoter which is upregulated under the growth-inhibitory conditions in yeast, candida maltosa", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (19990519), vol. 258, no. 3, pages 611 - 615, XP002969554 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0631 | [A] - OHKUMA M. ET AL., "Evidence that the expression of the gene for NADPH-cytochrome P-450 reductase id n-alkane-inducible in candida maltosa", BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (199507), vol. 59, no. 7, pages 1328 - 1330, XP002969555 |