EP1471962 - BREATHING ASSISTANCE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited P.O. Box 14348 Panmure 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 1006 / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited P.O. Box 14348, Panmure, 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 1006 / NZ | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited P.O. Box 14348, Panmure, 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki, Auckland 1006 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACKIE, Scott Robert P.O. Box 14348 Panmure 37 Regina Street Ponsonby, 1002 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
WHITE, Craig Karl P.O. Box 14348 Panmure 17A Buttle Street Remuera, 1005 Auckland / NZ | 03 /
FOREMAN, Mark P.O. Box 14348 Panmure 32 Oranga Avenue One Tree Hill, 1003 Auckland / NZ | [2014/11] |
Former [2004/45] | 01 /
MACKIE, Scott Robert P.O. Box 14348, Panmure, 37 Regina Street Ponsonby, 1002 Auckland / NZ | ||
02 /
WHITE, Craig Karl P.O. Box 14348, Panmure, 17A Buttle Street Remuera, 1005 Auckland / NZ | |||
03 /
FOREMAN, Mark P.O. Box 14348, Panmure, 32 Oranga Avenue One Tree Hill, 1003 Auckland / NZ | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03715867.2 | 03.02.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003NZ00012 | Priority number, date | NZ20020517031 | 04.02.2002 Original published format: NZ 51703102 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03066145 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471962 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471962 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/10, A61M16/16 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
A61M16/0683 (EP,US);
A61M16/0006 (EP,US);
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/0672 (EP,US);
A61M16/1085 (EP,US);
A61M16/109 (EP,US);
A61M16/1095 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
A61M16/209 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | A61M16/00, A61M16/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER ATMUNG | [2004/45] | English: | BREATHING ASSISTANCE APPARATUS | [2004/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE RESPIRATOIRE | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 04.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14150364.9 / EP2799103 | EP16151504.4 / EP3050589 | EP20171533.1 / EP3738635 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2003 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3807445 (MC PHEE C) [Y] 6* the whole document *; | [XY]WO9857691 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,7,8,11 * page 4, lines 13-26 * * claims 1-4,18 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-6; | [X]US6050260 (DANIELL MICHAEL GRENFELL [NZ], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10 * column 3, lines 40-61 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO0072905 (VOSS TORSTEN DE [DK]) [Y] 2-5 * page 11, line 11 - page 14, line 4 * * figures 1,4,5a * | International search | [X]WO8602276 (OXYGEN ENRICHMENT CO LTD [US]); | [A]US4686354 (MAKIN RONALD P [GB]); | [Y]FR2638361 (DIFFUSION TECH FRANCAISE SARL [FR]); | [A]WO9220392 (CALOR AIR SEPARATION LTD [GB]); | [Y]US5558084 (DANIELL MICHAEL G [NZ], et al); | [A]US6332462 (KROHN HOLGER [DE]) | by applicant | WO0072905 | WO0141854 |