EP1476367 - ARTICLE CARRIER AND BLANK THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC MeadWestvaco Corporate Center 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, Virginia 23060 / US | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC One High Ridge Park Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBRAS, Philippe 13, rue de la Bièvre 36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [2004/47] | 01 /
LEBRAS, Philippe 13, rue de la Bièvre F-36000 Chateauroux / FR | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Baldwin, Mark, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03716134.6 | 21.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US05391 | Priority number, date | GB20020004090 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: GB 0204090 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03072453 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476367 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476367 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B65D71/0055 (EP);
B65D2571/00141 (EP);
B65D2571/0029 (EP);
B65D2571/00475 (EP);
B65D2571/00512 (EP);
B65D2571/00524 (EP);
B65D2571/0066 (EP);
B65D2571/00728 (EP);
B65D2571/00753 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTIKELTRÄGER UND ZUSCHNITT DAFÜR | [2004/47] | English: | ARTICLE CARRIER AND BLANK THEREFOR | [2004/47] | French: | CASIER POUR ARTICLES ET DECOUPE A CET EFFET | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 13.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | BE | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | CZ | 21.02.2009 | IE | 21.02.2009 | LU | 21.02.2009 | SK | 21.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 21.02.2009 | ||
LU | 21.02.2009 | ||
SK | 21.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 21.02.2009 | ||
LU | 21.02.2009 | ||
SK | 21.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 21.02.2009 | ||
SK | 21.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 21.02.2009 | ||
SK | 21.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2009 | ||
IE | 21.02.2009 | ||
SK | 21.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2009 | ||
SK | 21.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2376040 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE2723957 (MEAD CORP) [Y] 1-14 * page 5 - page 10; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4146168 (HARTLINE HERBERT A) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 25; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US5400901 (HARRELSON GLEN R [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-14 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0172599 (MEAD CORP [US], et al) [A] 5,6* figures 9-13 *; | [PY]WO0214175 (MEAD CORP [US], et al) [PY] 5,6 * figures 1-3 * |