EP1490024 - EFFERVESCENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ALENDRONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | EFFERVESCENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BISPHOSPHONATES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | ||
[2011/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EffRx Pharmaceuticals SA Avenue du Théâtre 1 c/o KPMG SA 1005 Lausanne / CH | [2011/27] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Effrx, Inc. 1095 Jupiter Drive, Suite 11 Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Lifizz, Inc. Suite 11, 1095 Jupiter Park Drive Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCALLISTER, David 11505 Fairchild Gardens Avenue Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US | 02 /
ROSEN, Christer 17537 S.E. Conch Bar Avenue Tequesta, FL 33469 / US | [2005/20] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
MCCALLISTER, David 8469 Ironhorse Court West Palm Beach, FL 33412 / US | ||
02 /
ROSEN, Christer 17537 S.E. Conch Bar Avenue Tequesta, FL 33469 / US | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03716287.2 | 06.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US06576 | Priority number, date | US20020092083 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: US 92083 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075884 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490024 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490024 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/663, A61K9/46 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/663 (EP,US);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/341, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/426, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2011/18] | A61K31/341, A61K31/4164, A61K31/426 | ||
Former IPC [2005/01] | A61K9/00, A61K31/663 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | BRAUSETABLETTEN, ENTHALTEND ALENDRONAT | [2011/18] | English: | EFFERVESCENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING ALENDRONATE | [2011/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS EFFERVESCENTES CONTENANT DE L'ALENDRONATE | [2011/18] |
Former [2005/01] | BRAUSETABLETTEN, ENTHALTEND BISPHOSPHONATE, UND DEREN GEBRAUCH ZUR MEDIZINISCHEN BEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2005/01] | EFFERVESCENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BISPHOSPHONATES AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | ||
Former [2005/01] | COMPOSITIONS EFFERVESCENTES CONTENANT DES BISPHOSPHONATES ET METHODES CONNEXES | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010775.4 / EP2277503 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2005 | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2003 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | IE | 06.03.2012 | LU | 06.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
LU | 06.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 18.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2153225 (GENTILI IST SPA) [X] 1,10-21,23-25,32-35 * the whole document * [Y] 30,31,40-42; | [Y]US5393531 (GERHARD GERGELY [AT], et al) [Y] 1-43 * column 1, lines 28-34 ** column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 7; example 10 *; | [Y]US5415870 (GERGELY GERHARD [AT], et al) [Y] 4,7,28,29 * column 1, lines 27-34; examples 6,7 *; | [XY]WO9744017 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,10-21,23-25,32-35 * the whole document * [Y] 30,31,40-42; | [XY]US2001002395 (DAIFOTIS ANASTASIA G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-14,19,22-24,26,27,32-39 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0100] * * sentences 7,8, paragraph 101 * * paragraphs [0108] - [0111] * * claims 1,12,14,18,28 * [Y] 4,7,28,29; | [Y]WO0139724 (UNIV CALIFORNIA SAN DIEGO [US], et al) [Y] 30,31,40-42 * abstract * * page 15, lines 12-14 *; | [Y] - GERTZ B J ET AL, "STUDIES OF THE ORAL BIOAVAILABILITY OF ALENDRONATE", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST LOUIS, MO, US, (199509), vol. 58, no. 3, ISSN 0009-9236, pages 288 - 298, XP001006243 [Y] 1-43 * abstract * * page 294, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-9236(95)90245-7 | by applicant | US4462982 | US4687662 | US4710384 | US4942039 | US5178878 | US5348745 | US5415870 | US5480652 | US5709886 | US5853759 | US5994329 | US6015801 | US6225294 | EP1127573 | US6284272 | US6333316 |