EP1490093 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville California 94608-2916 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRISON, Stephen, D. 1369 Francisco Street Berkeley, CA 94702 / US | 02 /
WAGMAN, Allan, S. 600 Canyon Oaks Drive, Unit E Oakland, CA 94605 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Kathleen, A. 1057 Siler Place Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03716314.4 | 03.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US06742 | Priority number, date | US20020361417P | 01.03.2002 Original published format: US 361417 P | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074072 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490093 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/444, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4725, A61K31/506, A61K31/5377, A61K45/06, A61P9/10 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/4725 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | A61K38/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ISCHÄMIE | [2005/01] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIA | [2005/01] | French: | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DE L'ISCHEMIE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9965897 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,12-17,23-26 * claims 1-72,82-84,88 * * page 4, lines 9-25 * * page 5, line 5 - page 16, line 16 * * page 16, line 28 - page 17, line 3 * * page 239 - page 240; example 268 * * examples 4-264 *; | [X]WO0021927 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-14,23-26 * claim 19 * * page 31, lines 3-14 * * page 32, lines 3-7 ** pages 35-44; examples 1,4-7,10,11 *; | [X]WO0038675 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-14,23-26 * claims 1,4,8,10,11 * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 8 * * page 10, paragraphs 2,3 *; | [X]EP1136493 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [X] 1,12-14,23-26 * claims 1,6-9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0041]; table 1 *; | [X]WO0170727 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [X] 1,12-14,23-26 * claims 1-9 * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 19 * * page 20, line 38 - page 21, line 1 * * page 24 - page 35; tables 1-3; compounds 1-23 *; | [X]WO0174771 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,12-14,23-26 * claims 1,4,5 * * page 2, lines 16-31 * * page 25, lines 12-16 * * page 57 - page 59; examples F1-F30 *; | [X]US2001044436 (NUSS JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,12-14,23-26 * claims 1,69,72-74,78 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0029] , [0059] * * page 15 - page 17; examples 3,4,14,16 * | International search | [X]EP1136493 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al); | [X]US2002147146 (ELDAR-FINKELMAN HAGIT [IL]); | [X]WO0170727 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al); | [X]US6417185 (GOFF DANE A [US], et al); | [X]US2001044436 (NUSS JOHN M [US], et al) |