EP1494759 - PERSONAL CONTAINMENT SYSTEM WITH SEALED PASSTHROUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODELL, Raymond Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GRAVES, Jason, A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3424 / US | 03 /
AVERY, Martin, J. Post Office Box 3427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03716736.8 | 19.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US08630 | Priority number, date | US20020121306 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: US 121306 | US20020263894 | 03.10.2002 Original published format: US 263894 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03086542 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494759 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494759 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1494759 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A62B17/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
A62B17/006 (EP,US);
A62B31/00 (EP,US);
A62B18/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSÖNLICHES EINDÄMMUNGSSYSTEM MIT ABGEDICHTETER DURCHFUHR | [2005/02] | English: | PERSONAL CONTAINMENT SYSTEM WITH SEALED PASSTHROUGH | [2005/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONFINEMENT PERSONNEL A SAS ETANCHE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2006 | BE | 30.08.2006 | CH | 30.08.2006 | CY | 30.08.2006 | CZ | 30.08.2006 | EE | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | LI | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | RO | 30.08.2006 | SI | 30.08.2006 | SK | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | BG | 30.11.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | PT | 12.02.2007 | HU | 01.03.2007 | IE | 19.03.2007 | LU | 19.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CY | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
IE | 19.03.2007 | ||
LU | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
IE | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
IE | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
IE | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
RO | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SI | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8604508 (PONN JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 5, lines 175-177 * * page 10, lines 358-364 * * page 12, lines 436-443 - page 13, line 444 * * page 17, lines 593-624; figures 1A,5A,5B *; | [A]GB2220573 (RACAL PANORAMA LTD [GB]) [A] 15* figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE9304883U (TESIMAX-ALTINGER GMBH) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 15-27 * * page 4, lines 7-11; figure - *; | [X]WO0141873 (HAAGER BIRGIT [AT]) [X] 1,7,9,14 * page 3, lines 17-21 - page 4, lines 1-3; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO0174449 |