EP1494711 - METHODS FOR TREATING CHRONIC OBSTRUCTIVE PULMONARY DISEASE (COPD) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abgenix, Inc. 6701 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Abgenix, Inc. 6701 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | ||
For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xiao-dong 2833 Bryant Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
BELL, Gregory, M. 157 Trinidad Drive Tiburon, CA 94920 / US | 03 /
GLADUE, Ronald, P. 83 Rowley Drive Stonington, CT 06378 / US | 04 /
KUDLACZ, Elizabeth, M. 24 Thomas Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | 05 /
SHOWELL, Henry, J. 231 Seaside Avenue Westbrook, CT 06498 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Brants, Johan Philippe Emile, et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 03716745.9 | 18.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US08662 | Priority number, date | US20020366426P | 19.03.2002 Original published format: US 366426 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080117 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494711 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P11/00 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CHRONISCH-OBSTRUKTIVER LUNGENERKRANKUNG (COPD) | [2005/02] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING CHRONIC OBSTRUCTIVE PULMONARY DISEASE (COPD) | [2005/02] | French: | PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA BRONCHO-PNEUMOPATHIE CHRONIQUE OBSTRUCTIVE (BPCO) | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 07.07.2008 | Observations by third parties | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5677426 (FONG SHERMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example c *; | [A]US5874080 (HEBERT CAROLINE A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example I *; | [PX] - BEEH KAI M ET AL, "Neutrophil chemotactic activity of sputum from patients with COPD: role of interleukin 8 and leukotriene B4.", CHEST APR 2003, (200304), vol. 123, no. 4, ISSN 0012-3692, pages 1240 - 1247, XP002477497 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.123.4.1240 | [T] - HUANG S ET AL, "Fully humanized neutralizing antibodies to interleukin-8 (ABX-IL8) inhibit angiogenesis, tumor growth, and metastasis of human melanoma", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200207), vol. 161, no. 1, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 125 - 134, XP002359195 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6150584 (KUCHERLAPATI RAJU [US], et al) | other | - ABGENIX, INC., "Abgenix submits ind application to fda for abx-il8 in leading pulmonary disease", PRESS RELEASE, (20010920), page 1, XP003023161 | - YAMAMOTO C. ET AL., "Airway inflammation in copd assessed by sputum levels of interleukin-8", CHEST, (199708), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 505 - 510, XP003023162 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1378/chest.112.2.505 | - PESCI A. ET AL., "Inflammatory cells and mediators in bronchial lavage of patients with chronic obstructive pulmonary disease", EUR RESPIR J, (1998), vol. 12, pages 380 - 386, XP003023163 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1183/09031936.98.12020380 | - YANG Y-D. ET AL., "FULLY HUMAN ANTI-INTERLEUKIN-8 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES: POTENTIAL THERAPEUTICS FORTHE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASE STATES", J. LEUKOCYTE BIOL., (1999), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 401 - 410, XP001014326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlb.66.3.401 |