EP1498179 - CERAMICS HONEYCOMB STRUCTURAL BODY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE STRUCTURAL BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Sadaaki, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
KAWAE, Takayuki, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Yasushi, c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03717565.0 | 11.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP04622 | Priority number, date | JP20020123463 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002123463 | JP20030056524 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003056524 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090929 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498179 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01D53/86, B28B11/04, C04B41/87, F01N3/28 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01D53/885 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
F01N2260/14 (EP,US);
F01N2260/18 (EP,US);
F01N2330/34 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERAMIKWABENSTRUKTURKÖRPER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/03] | English: | CERAMICS HONEYCOMB STRUCTURAL BODY AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE STRUCTURAL BODY | [2005/03] | French: | CORPS STRUCTUREL CERAMIQUE EN NIDS D'ABEILLE ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE LE CORPS STRUCTUREL | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | Translation filed | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4255316 (BLIZZARD JOHN D) [A] 12-18 * column 4, line 48 - line 68; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH01145377 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH01145378 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [X]EP1106589 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 12,13 * example 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US2001003728 (ITO KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 3* example -; claims 1,4 * | International search | [Y]JP2001031465 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]US6242072 (UEDA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2001003728 (ITO KEIJI [JP], et al) |