EP1608275 - PEDICLE SCREW SPINAL FIXATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bryan, Donald W. 6151 South Woodland Drive Ogden, UT 84403 / US | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [2005/52] | Application number, filing date | 03718067.6 | 26.03.2003 | [2005/52] | WO2003US09251 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096065 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608275 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/7011 (EP);
A61B17/7038 (EP);
A61B17/7041 (EP);
A61B17/7043 (EP);
A61B17/8875 (EP);
A61B2090/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPINALE FIXATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT PEDIKELSCHRAUBEN | [2005/52] | English: | PEDICLE SCREW SPINAL FIXATION DEVICE | [2005/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION VERTEBRAL A VIS PEDICULAIRE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 02.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 27.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0355035 (SYNTHES AG [CH]) [X] 1,11,20,25,34-36,41,43 * column 3, line 18 - line 30; figure 3 *; | [X]WO9400066 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,16,20-23,25,26,34-39,41-43,47 * page 4, line 3 - line 9 * * page 5, line 1 - line 6 * * page 15, line 14 - line 26 * * figures 1,2,4,9,10 *; | [XY]FR2714287 (BORNERT DIDIER [FR], et al) [X] 1,6,7,13,14,16,20,21,23,24,26,34-37,39,40,42,43,47 * page 4, line 8 - line 15 * * page 4, line 33 - line 35 * * page 5, line 5 - line 35 * * figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 8-12,15,17,19,27,29-33,44-46,49; | [Y]US5947965 (BRYAN DONALD W [US]) [Y] 8,15,17,19,30-32,45,46 * column 4, line 59 - line 65; figures 1,5A-B *; | [Y]WO0119266 (ULRICH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 9-12,27,29,33,44,49* page 2, line 9 - line 13; figures 1,4,8 *; | [X]US2002082603 (DIXON ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11,20,25,34-36,41,43 * paragraph [0011]; figures 1,5a; claim 3 * | International search | [A]US5938663 (PETRETO ERIC [FR]); | [A]US6179838 (FIZ DANIEL [AR]); | [A]US6355039 (TROUSSEL SERGE [BE], et al) |