EP1495601 - TELEPHONY SERVICES SYSTEM WITH INSTANT COMMUNICATIONS ENHANCEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verizon Business Global LLC 22001 Loundon County Parkway Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | [2008/25] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Worldcom, Inc. 500 Clinton Center Drive Clinton, MS 39056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Richard, G. 7018 Pleasant Ridge Drive, SW Cedar Rapids, IA 52404 / US | 02 /
MUMFORD, Gregory, L. 3345 Jonquil Lane Marion, IA 52302 / US | 03 /
GUNASEKAR, Duraisamy 2101 Fox Trail Drive, NE Cedar Rapids, IA 52402 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Hofmann, Harald Sonnenberg Fortmann, Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03718147.6 | 02.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US10003 | Priority number, date | US20020369271P | 02.04.2002 Original published format: US 369271 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03085913 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495601 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495601 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/04, G10L15/26, G10L19/00, H04L12/58, H04M7/00, H04L29/06, H04M1/64 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H04M15/7655 (EP,US);
G06F40/40 (US);
G06F40/58 (US);
G06Q20/085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (US);
G10L13/00 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/1813 (EP,US);
H04L12/1822 (EP,US);
H04L45/308 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/56 (EP,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L65/401 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
H04L67/565 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/07 (EP,US);
H04M15/08 (EP,US);
H04M15/09 (EP,US);
H04M15/51 (EP,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,US);
H04M15/56 (EP,US);
H04M15/57 (EP,US);
H04M15/63 (EP,US);
H04M15/77 (EP,US);
H04M15/772 (EP,US);
H04M15/8292 (EP,US);
H04M15/83 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/42127 (EP,US);
H04M3/42229 (EP,US);
H04M3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/465 (EP,US);
H04M3/5322 (EP,US);
H04M7/0003 (US);
H04M7/003 (US);
H04M7/0045 (EP,US);
H04M7/0048 (US);
H04M7/0051 (US);
H04M7/0054 (EP,US);
H04M7/125 (EP,US);
H04M7/1295 (EP,US);
H04N21/2335 (US);
H04N21/234309 (US);
H04N21/234336 (US);
H04N21/440236 (US);
H04L12/1827 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
H04M2201/60 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2066 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4509 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4536 (EP,US);
H04M2215/202 (EP,US);
H04M2215/208 (EP,US);
H04M2215/44 (EP,US);
H04M2215/54 (EP,US);
H04M2215/62 (EP,US);
H04M2215/64 (EP,US);
H04M2215/66 (EP,US);
H04M2215/725 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7254 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7263 (EP,US);
H04M2215/82 (EP,US);
H04M2242/30 (EP,US);
H04M3/4931 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | H04L12/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNSPRECHDIENSTESYSTEM MIT INSTANT-KOMMUNIKATIONSERWEITERUNGEN | [2005/02] | English: | TELEPHONY SERVICES SYSTEM WITH INSTANT COMMUNICATIONS ENHANCEMENTS | [2005/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE SERVICES TELEPHONIQUES AVEC RENFORCEMENTS DE COMMUNICATIONS INSTANTANEES | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | IE | 02.04.2009 | LU | 02.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0069140 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-47 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0135615 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 36 ** figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2002037074 (DOWENS JAC P [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 5,6,15-18 * * page 2, paragraphs 23-27 * * page 3, paragraphs 32-34,37 * * page 4, paragraph 41 * * page 5, paragraphs 50-52,56 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY] - SIP WG J ROSENBERG DYNAMICSOFT H SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA U G CAMARILLO ERICSSON A JOHNSTON WORLDCOM J PETERSON NEUSTAR R SPARKS DYNAM, "SIP: Session Initiation Protocol", DRAFT-IETF-SIP-RFC2543BIS-09.TXT, (20020227), ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 281, XP015028051 [X] 1,3,6,14-20,22-27,29,30,37-43,47 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,5,7-9,21,31-33,44-46 | [Y] - PING PAN (BELL LABS) HENNING SCHULZRINNE (COLUMBIA U) PAT CALHOUN (SUN), "DIAMETER: Policy and Accounting Extension for SIP", DRAFT-PAN-DIAMETER-SIP-01.TXT, (19981115), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 17, XP015033685 [Y] 2,4,5,7-9,21,31-33,44-46 * the whole document * | [A] - SIP WG ROSENBERG/MATAGA/SCHULZRINNE DYNAMICSOFT/COLUMBIA U, "An Application Server Component Architecture for SIP", DRAFT-ROSENBERG-SIP-APP-COMPONENTS-01.TXT, (20010302), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 39, XP015034691 [A] 1-47 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2001034718 (SHAKED SHVAT [IL], et al); | [XP]WO02093889 (WORLDCOM INC [US]); | [XP]US2003112948 (BROWN WENDELL [US], et al) |