EP1496753 - CHEWING GUM BASE AND CHEWING GUM WITH ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYVINYLACETATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY 410 North Michigan Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60611 / US | [2007/24] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY 410 North Michigan Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS, Lasha 80 South Gibson Road Apt. 924, Building 9 Henderson, NV 89012 / US | 02 /
BUNCZEK, Michael 5931 Meadow Drive Lisle, IL 60532 / US | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03718446.2 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US12014 | Priority number, date | US20020063405 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: US 63405 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088757 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496753 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496753 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23G4/08 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A23G4/06 (EP,US);
A23G4/066 (EP,US);
A23G4/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | A23G3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUGUMMIGRUNDLAGE UND KAUGUMMI MIT SEHR HOCHMOLEKULAREM POLYVINYLACETAT | [2005/03] | English: | CHEWING GUM BASE AND CHEWING GUM WITH ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYVINYLACETATE | [2005/03] | French: | BASE DE CHEWING-GUM ET CHEWING-GUM CONTENANT DU POLYVINYLACETATE DE POIDS MOLECULAIRE ULTRA-ELEVE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 13.06.2007 | |
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9700619 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US], et al) [Y] 11* page 2, line 14 - line 21; claim 17 *; | [XY]WO0008944 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [X] 1-10,13-16,24,25 * claims 1,2,4,5,13-15 * [Y] 11 | International search | [Y]US4357355 (KOCH EDWIN R, et al); | [A]US4711784 (YANG ROBERT K [US]); | [A]US4992280 (YUNG CHU ANITA W [US], et al); | [A]US5108762 (BRODERICK KEVIN B [US], et al); | [X]US5601858 (MANSUKHANI GUL [US], et al); | [X]US6190706 (BUNCZEK MICHAEL T [US], et al); | [A]US6238710 (SONG JOO H [US], et al) |