EP1493245 - METHOD FOR THE OUTPUT OF STATUS DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDERA, Ralf Kantstrasse 18 64347 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
HEIDEMANN, Cornelius Heinrichstrasse 53 64283 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
MENDE, Joachim Draustr. 38 64347 Griesheim / DE | 04 /
DÖRKEN, Heinrich Kölner Str. 8 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/46] |
Former [2008/39] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann & Borchert Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03718600.4 | 21.02.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003DE00539 | Priority number, date | DE2002110707 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210707 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084135 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493245 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493245 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/26 | [2010/47] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2005/01] | H04L12/26, G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE VON ZUSTANDSDATEN | [2005/01] | English: | METHOD FOR THE OUTPUT OF STATUS DATA | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE SORTIE DE DONNEES D'ETAT | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2003 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | IE | 03.08.2011 | IT | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | AT | 21.02.2012 | LU | 21.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
AT | 21.02.2012 | ||
LU | 21.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
TR | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
AT | 21.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/31] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
AT | 21.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
IT | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 03.08.2011 | Cited in | Examination | WO9821845 | WO0031963 |