EP1481472 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND PROCESSING ELECTRIC AND OPTICAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwarte, Rudolf Kreuztaler Strasse 56 57250 Netphen / DE | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Weber, Roland, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Weber, Roland, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Patentanwälte Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03718602.0 | 21.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003DE00542 | Priority number, date | DE2002107610 | 22.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10207610 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03073602 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481472 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481472 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03D9/06 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G01J9/00 (EP,US);
H03D9/0608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG UND VERARBEITUNG ELEKTRISCHER UND OPTISCHER SIGNALE | [2004/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND PROCESSING ELECTRIC AND OPTICAL SIGNALS | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETECTER ET DE TRAITER DES SIGNAUX ELECTRIQUES ET OPTIQUES | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 22.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.12.2008 | CZ | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | IE | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | AT | 21.02.2009 | LU | 21.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
AT | 21.02.2009 | ||
LU | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
AT | 21.02.2009 | ||
LU | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
AT | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
AT | 21.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19704496 (SCHWARTE RUDOLF PROF DR ING [DE]) [A] 1,14 * page 6, line 16 - line 25; figure 3 *; | [DA]WO9960629 (SCHWARTE RUDOLF [DE]) [DA] 1-31 * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 15; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP1152261 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [A] 1,14 * figure 3 *; | [A] - SCHWARTE R ET AL, New electro-optical mixing and correlating sensor: facilities and applications of the photonic mixer device (PMD), PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, VOL. 3100, PAGE(S) 245-253, ISSN 0277-786X, XP002080273 [A] 1-31 * page 246, line 41 - page 248, line 29; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.287751 |