EP1501848 - SYNTHESIS OF LOCKED NUCLEIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santaris Pharma A/S Bøge Allé 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Santaris Pharma A/S Boge Allé 3 2970 Horsholm / DK | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Santaris Pharma A/S Boge Allé 3 2970 Horsholm / DK | ||
For all designated states Exiqon A/S Bygstubben 9 2950 Vedbaek / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORENSEN, Mads, Detlef Skotterupgade 2, 4 tv DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | 02 /
WENGEL, Jesper Rugmarken 48 DK-5260 Odense S. / DK | 03 /
KOCH, Troels Funkiavej 47 DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Signe, M. Gammeltoftsgade 24, 3. tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | 05 /
Rosenbohm, Christoph Kirsebaerlunden 25 3460 Birkerod / DK | 06 /
Pedersen, Daniel Sejer, Darwin College Silver Street Cambridge CB3 9EU / GB | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
SORENSEN, Mads, Detlef Humlebaeksgade 33, st. th. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
02 /
WENGEL, Jesper Rugmarken 48 DK-5260 Odense S. / DK | |||
03 /
KOCH, Troels Funkiavej 47 DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK | |||
04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Signe, M. Gammeltoftsgade 24, 3. tv. DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | |||
05 /
Rosenbohm, Christoph Frederikssundsvej 55, 4. th. DK-2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | |||
06 /
Pedersen, Daniel Sejer, Darwin College Silver Street Cambridge CB3 9EU / GB | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2005/05] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen O / DK | Application number, filing date | 03718663.2 | 08.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003DK00305 | Priority number, date | DK20020000712 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: DK 200200712 | DK20020001214 | 16.08.2002 Original published format: DK 200201214 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095467 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1501848 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501848 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/00 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP);
C07H19/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON LOCKED NUCLEIC ACID-DERIVATEN | [2005/05] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF LOCKED NUCLEIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2005/05] | French: | SYNTHESE DE DERIVES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES LNA | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | BE | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | CZ | 08.08.2007 | EE | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | RO | 08.08.2007 | SI | 08.08.2007 | SK | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | BG | 08.11.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | HU | 09.02.2008 | IE | 08.05.2008 | LU | 08.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
HU | 09.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
LU | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
LU | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
BG | 08.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AX]WO0066604 (EXIQON AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-32,44-52 * the whole document * [X] 33-43,53-55; | [AX]WO0228875 (CUREON AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-32,44-52 * the whole document * [X] 33-43,53-55; | [X] - ULRICH JORDIS ET AL, "Synthesis of (1S,4S)-2-Thia-5-azabicyclo(2.2.1)heptane", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (198904), vol. 28B, pages 294 - 296, XP002252478 [X] 1-55 * the whole document * | [X] - LISBET KVAERNO ET AL, "Synthesis of a Novel Bicyclic Nucleoside Restricted to an S-Type Conformation and Initial Evaluation of Its Hybridization Properties When Incorporated into Oligodeoxynucleotides", J. ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, pages 5106 - 5112, XP002252479 [X] 1-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo015602v | [X] - VELIMIR POPSAVIN ET AL, "An alternative synthesis of (+)-epiallo-muscarine from D-glucose", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 269, pages 343 - 347, XP002252480 [X] 1-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(94)00363-K | [AX] - SANJAY K. SINGH ET AL, "Synthesis of 2'-Amino-LNA: A Novel Conformationally Restricted High-Affinity Oligonucleotide Analogue with a Handle", J. ORG. CHEM., (1998), vol. 63, pages 10035 - 10039, XP002252481 [A] 1-32,44-52 * the whole document * [X] 33-43,53-55 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9814445 | [A] - GEORGE W. J. FLEET ET AL, "The synthesis from D-xylose of the potent and specific enantiomeric glucosidase inhibitors, 1,4-dideoxy-1,4-imino-D-arabinitol and 1,4-dideoxy-1,4-imino-L-arabinitol", TETRAHEDRON, (1986), vol. 42, no. 20, pages 5685 - 5692, XP002252482 [A] 1-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)88174-6 | [PX] - CHRISTOPH ROSENBOHM ET AL, "Synthesis of 2'-amino-LNA: a new strategy", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 655 - 663, XP002252483 [PX] 1-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b208864a | [PX] - TORSTEN BRYLD ET AL, "Synthesis and antiviral evaluation of novel conformationally locked mucleosides and masked 5'-phosphate derivatives thereof", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS., (2002), vol. 1, pages 1655 - 1662, XP002252484 [PX] 1-43,53-55 * see compound 27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b203484k |