EP1481467 - ELECTROACTIVE POLYMER DEVICES FOR CONTROLLING FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2010/23] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Sri International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIM, Jonathon, R. 61 Clarendon Road Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 02 /
PELRINE, Ronald, E. 802 Owl Drivet Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 03 /
KORNBLUH, Roy, David 260 Palo Alto Drive Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 04 /
ECKERLE, Joseph S. Star Route, Box 20 Redwood City, CA 94025 / US | 05 /
ROSENTHAL, Marcus 515B Monterey Road Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 06 /
HEYDT, Richard, P. 1090 Guinda Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2005/09] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
HEIM, Jonathon, R. 61 Clarendon Road Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | ||
02 /
PELRINE, Ronald, E. 79 Huron Court Boulder, CO 80303 / US | |||
03 /
KORNBLUH, Roy, David 260 Palo Alto Drive Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | |||
04 /
ECKERLE, Joseph S. Star Route, Box 20 Redwood City, CA 94025 / US | |||
05 /
ROSENTHAL, Marcus 515B Monterey Road Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | |||
06 /
HEYDT, Richard, P. 1090 Guinda Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Representative(s) | Lotze, Rüdiger Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Lotze, Rüdiger Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/38] | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03719361.2 | 05.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003US07115 | Priority number, date | US20020362560P | 05.03.2002 Original published format: US 362560 P | US20020154449 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: US 154449 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03107523 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1481467 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1481467 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02N1/00, H01L41/09, H01L41/16, F04B35/00, F04B43/04 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F04B35/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (EP);
F01L1/46 (EP);
F01L7/02 (EP);
F01L9/20 (EP);
F04B43/043 (EP,US);
F15D1/025 (EP);
F15D1/065 (EP);
A61M5/14276 (EP);
F01L2301/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | H02N1/00, H01L41/09, H01L41/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROAKTIVE POLYMERBAUELEMENTE ZUR REGELUNG EINER FLUIDSTRÖMUNG | [2004/49] | English: | ELECTROACTIVE POLYMER DEVICES FOR CONTROLLING FLUID FLOW | [2004/49] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POLYMERES ELECTROACTIFS PERMETTANT DE REGULER UN ECOULEMENT FLUIDIQUE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10005902.1 / EP2276163 | EP10012772.9 / EP2299585 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2010 | BE | 09.06.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | FI | 09.06.2010 | HU | 09.06.2010 | IT | 09.06.2010 | NL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SE | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | GR | 10.09.2010 | ES | 20.09.2010 | PT | 11.10.2010 | IE | 05.03.2011 | LU | 05.03.2011 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
HU | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
BE | 09.06.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
PT | 11.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
NL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
GR | 10.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
FI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SE | 09.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 09.06.2010 | |
SE | 09.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9937921 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,17-20 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 19 * * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 32 ** figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO0106575 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13,16-20 * page 1, line 5 - line 15 * * page 21, line 36 - page 22, line 17 * * page 26, line 3 - page 45, line 16 * * page 41, line 23 - page 45, line 2 * * figures 1E,1F,2A-2C,6 *; | [X]US2002013545 (SOLTANPOUR DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,16-20 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1a,2,3 * | International search | [A]US3050034 (BENTON ROBERT C); | [A]US4284921 (LEMONON CLAIRE, et al); | [A]US5481152 (BUSCHULTE RAINER [DE]); | [A]US5509888 (MILLER PAUL L [US]); | [A]US5933170 (TAKEUCHI YUKIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US6093995 (LAZARUS KENNETH B [US], et al); | [A]US6343129 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al); | [AP]US6435840 (SHARMA RAVI [US], et al); | [AE]US6545384 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al) |