EP1512212 - ROTARY PERMANENT MAGNET ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH VARYING AIR GAP BETWEEN INTERFACING STATOR AND ROTOR ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MANUFACTURING & SERVICES SAS 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Wavecrest Laboratories, LLC 45600 Terminal Drive Dulles, VA 20166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASLOV, Boris, A. 10814 Oldfield Drive Reston, VA 20191 / US | 02 /
SOGHOMONIAN, Zareh, Salmasi 22340 Great Trail Terrace Sterling, VA 20164 / US | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03719436.2 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003US08673 | Priority number, date | US20020160257 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: US 160257 | US20020160254 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: US 160254 | US20020207848 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 207848 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105318 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512212 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/12, H02K1/14 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
H02K1/12 (KR);
H02K1/14 (KR);
H02K1/18 (KR);
H02K1/22 (KR);
H02K1/26 (KR);
H02K1/27 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER PERMANENTMAGNETDREHMOTOR MIT LUFTSPALT WECHSENLDER BREITE ZWISCHEN ROTOR- UND STATORELEMENTEN | [2005/10] | English: | ROTARY PERMANENT MAGNET ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH VARYING AIR GAP BETWEEN INTERFACING STATOR AND ROTOR ELEMENTS | [2005/10] | French: | MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE A AIMANT PERMANENT ROTATIF AVEC ENTREFER VARIABLE ENTRE LES ELEMENTS DE STATOR ET DE ROTOR EN INTERFACE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/07] | 23.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6329736 (BERNAUER CHRISTOF [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 33 - line 34; figures 1,6 *; | [X]US5041749 (GASER MIRKO [YU], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [XY]US4496887 (ICHIHARA NOBORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 5A * [Y] 10; | [X]EP0664600 (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7 * figures 32,33 *; | [X]JPH09103062 ; | [XY]US5962938 (BOBAY DENNIS P [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * column 4, line 11 - line 21; figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 49 - line 57 * [Y] 10; | [Y]DE19924038 (SCHAEFERTOENS JOERN H [DE]) [Y] 1,5,6,8,11 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 07, & JP09103062 A 19970415 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - ZHU Z Q ET AL, INFLUENCE OF DESIGN PARAMETERS ON COGGING TORQUE IN PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINES, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 15, NR. 4, PAGE(S) 407-412, (20001201), ISSN 0885-8969, XP002206342 [Y] 1,5,6,8,11 * paragraph [00IV]; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/60.900501 | Examination | US6188159 |