EP1503933 - ELECTRICALLY POWERED VEHICLES HAVING MOTOR AND POWER SUPPLY CONTAINED WITHIN WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MANUFACTURING & SERVICES SAS 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Matra Manufacturing & Services SAS 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Wavecrest Laboratories, LLC 45600 Terminal Drive Dulles, VA 20166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PYNTIKOV, Alexander, V. 21184 Sundial Court Ashburn, VA 20147 / US | 02 /
BENSON, Mark, A. 18260 Oak Lake Court Leesburg, VA 20176 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03719437.0 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US08676 | Priority number, date | US20020146024 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: US 146024 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097437 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1503933 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503933 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02, A61G5/04, B60K1/04 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
B62M6/45 (EP,US);
B62M6/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61G5/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/20 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,KR,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/19 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/21 (EP,KR,US);
B62M6/90 (EP,KR,US);
B60K2001/045 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2220/42 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2220/44 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2220/50 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/642 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2260/28 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/12 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENES FAHRZEUG MIT IN DEN RÄDERN ANGEORDNETEM MOTOR UND ENERGIEVERSORGUNG | [2005/06] | English: | ELECTRICALLY POWERED VEHICLES HAVING MOTOR AND POWER SUPPLY CONTAINED WITHIN WHEELS | [2005/06] | French: | VEHICULE A PROPULSION ELECTRIQUE DONT LE MOTEUR, LE REGULATEUR, ET L'ALIMENTATION SONT INTEGRES AUX ROUES | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Request for further processing for: | 19.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2006 | BE | 05.07.2006 | CY | 05.07.2006 | EE | 05.07.2006 | FI | 05.07.2006 | RO | 05.07.2006 | SI | 05.07.2006 | TR | 05.07.2006 | BG | 05.10.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | SE | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | HU | 06.01.2007 | IE | 28.03.2007 | LU | 28.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CY | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
LU | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 05.07.2006 | |
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 05.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE818737 (BAUER KARL) [Y] 18 * page 2, line 17 - line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2387139 (GUIMBAL JEAN [FR]) [A] 1,18 * figure - *; | [YA]EP0696537 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * figures 5,6 * [A] 1; | [A]US5581136 (LI I-HO [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]EP0807570 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3 * column 3, line 30 - line 33; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19732430 (KUTZE HARALD [DE]) [A] 18 * figure 1; claim 3 *; | [A]WO9930960 (BKTECH AG [CH], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29808758U (HELIODET GMBH ENTWICKLUNG MECH [DE]) [Y] 10-17 * page 2, line 20 - line 24 * * page 3, line 16 - line 25 * * page 7, line 10 - line 16 * * page 14, line 24 - line 26 * * figure 2; claim 14 *; | [XY]US6092615 (PUSCH MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 40 - line 61 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,4,5 * [Y] 2,6-18; | [YA]EP1137154 (TECHNICREA RECH [FR], et al) [Y] 6-9 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 25; figure 1A * [A] 1; | [PA]US2002100625 (BELTRAME CARLO LEO [AU], et al) [PA] 1 * abstract * |