EP1509989 - ROTARY ELECTRIC MOTOR HAVING A PLURALITY OF SKEWED STATOR POLES AND/OR ROTOR POLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA MANUFACTURING & SERVICES SAS 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | [2006/48] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Wavecrest Laboratories, LLC 45600 Terminal Drive Dulles, VA 20166 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOGHOMONIAN, Zareh, Salmasi 22340 Great Trail Terrace Sterling, VA 20164 / US | 02 /
MASLOV, Boris, A. 10814 Oldfield Drive Reston, VA 20191 / US | 03 /
BENSON, Mark, A. 18260 Oak Lake Court Leesburg, VA 20176 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Vougny, Christophe, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/09] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03719468.5 | 11.04.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US09206 | Priority number, date | US20020160257 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: US 160257 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105320 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509989 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/12, H02K1/27, H02K1/14 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
H02K1/12 (KR);
H02K1/14 (KR);
H02K1/141 (EP,US);
H02K21/12 (KR);
H02K21/22 (EP,US);
H02K29/03 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER DREHMOTOR MIT SCHRÄGVERLAUFENDEN STATOR- ODER ROTORPOLEN | [2005/09] | English: | ROTARY ELECTRIC MOTOR HAVING A PLURALITY OF SKEWED STATOR POLES AND/OR ROTOR POLES | [2005/09] | French: | MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE ROTATIF PRESENTANT UNE PLURALITE DE POLES STATORIQUES ET/OU DE POLES ROTORIQUES ASYMETRIQUES | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4424463 (MUSIL J DONALD [US]) [X] 1-5,7,11,12,14,16 * column 6, line 36 - line 58; figures 1,8,9 * [Y] 13; | [XY]US6188159 (FAN YANG-FUNG [TW]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * column 3, line 28 - line 36; figures 11,12,16 * * column 3, line 48 - line 50; figures 14,15 * * column 2, line 50 - line 51 * [Y] 7,16; | [Y]WO0219504 (HILL WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * figures 1,9; claim 1 *; | [YA]DE19924038 (SCHAEFERTOENS JOERN H [DE]) [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1,7,14,16; | [A]EP1052761 (KINOSHITA YUKIO [JP]) [A] 1,2,13,14 * paragraph [0096]; figures 3B-F *; | [A]JP2001119869 | [Y] - ZHU Z Q ET AL, INFLUENCE OF DESIGN PARAMETERS ON COGGING TORQUE IN PERMANENT MAGNET MACHINES, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 15, NR. 4, PAGE(S) 407-412, (20001201), ISSN 0885-8969, XP002206342 [Y] 1-16 * page 407, column 2 * * paragraph [00VI] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/60.900501 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001119869 A 20010427 (SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * |