EP1494673 - COMPOUNDS HAVING UNIQUE CB1 RECEPTOR BINDING SELECTIVITY AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE 3040 Cornwallis Road, P.O. Box 12194 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE 3040 Cornwallis Road, P.O. Box 12194 Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Brian, F. 3 Fontana Ct. Durham, NC 27713 / US | 02 /
SELTZMAN, Herbert, H. 4604 Hiddenbrook Drive Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | 03 /
FRANCISCO, Maria, Elena, Y. 1021 Okaland Avenue Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03719602.9 | 14.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US10470 | Priority number, date | US20020121708 | 15.04.2002 Original published format: US 121708 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088968 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494673 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494673 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4745, A61K31/415, A61K31/473, C07D471/02, C07D231/12, A61P3/04, A61P25/18 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
C07D231/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | A61K31/4745, A61K31/415, A61K31/473, C07D471/02, C07D231/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN MIT EINZIGARTIGER CB1-REZEPTOR-BINDUNGSSELEKTIVITÄT UND HERSTELLUNGS- UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/02] | English: | COMPOUNDS HAVING UNIQUE CB1 RECEPTOR BINDING SELECTIVITY AND METHODS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE | [2005/02] | French: | COMPOSES PRESENTANT UNE SELECTIVITE DE LIAISON AU RECEPTEUR CB1 UNIQUE ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 15.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | IE | 14.04.2009 | LU | 14.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
LU | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
LU | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 14.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XP]US6509367 (MARTIN BILLY R [US], et al); | [X] - WILEY J.L. ET AL., "Novel pyrazole cannabinoids: insights into CB1 receptor recognition and activation", J. P.E.T., (2001), vol. 296, pages 1013 - 1022, XP002968556 | [X] - SHIM J.-Y. ET AL., "Molecular interaction of the antagonist N-(piperidin-1-yl)-5-(4-chlorophenyl)-1-(2,4-dichlorophenyl)-4-methyl-1H-pyrazole-3-carboxamide with the CB1 cannabinoid receptor", J. MED. CHEM., (200203), vol. 45, pages 1447 - 1459, XP002968557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm010267o |