EP1490528 - ROTATING TUBULAR CATHODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WURCZINGER, Dieter Alte Strasse 31 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Schickedanz, Willi Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Schickedanz, Willi, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03720208.2 | 19.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003DE00903 | Priority number, date | DE2002113049 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10213049 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080891 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490528 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490528 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, H01J37/34 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H01J37/3497 (EP,US);
H01J37/3405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE [2005/07] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHBARE ROHRKATHODE | [2005/01] | English: | ROTATING TUBULAR CATHODE | [2005/01] | French: | CATHODE TUBULAIRE TOURNANTE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 17.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4407713 (ZEGA BOGDAN [CH]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]US4374722 (ZEGA BOGDAN [CH]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0992606 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, paragraph 65; figure 3 *; | [A]US5437778 (HEDGCOTH VIRGLE L [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 4; figure 4 * |