EP1487929 - POLYOL MIXTURE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYURETHANE GELCOATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CY, HU | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mankiewicz Gebr. & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Georg-Wilhelm-Strasse 189 D-21107 Hamburg / DE | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEHNER, Jochen Bansenstr. 17 21075 Hamburg / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03720329.6 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003EP02554 | Priority number, date | DE2002112391 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212391 | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03078534 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487929 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487929 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/00, C08G18/66, C08G18/78 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C09D175/12 (EP);
C08G18/6651 (EP);
C08G18/7831 (EP);
C08G2220/00 (EP);
C08K3/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | LT | 19.10.2004 | LV | 19.10.2004 | Title | German: | POLYOLMISCHUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHAN-GELCOATS | [2004/52] | English: | POLYOL MIXTURE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYURETHANE GELCOATS | [2004/52] | French: | MELANGE POLYOL DESTINE A LA PRODUCTION D'ENDUCTIONS POLYURETHANE EN GEL | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2003 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | AT | 12.03.2015 | IE | 12.03.2015 | LU | 12.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
AT | 12.03.2015 | ||
IE | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 20.08.2014 | |
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
SE | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19729982 (SIKA CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-18,23-26 * page 2, lines 45-52; example 2 *; | [X]US4695618 (MOWRER NORMAN R [US]) [X] 1-18,23-26 * column 5, lines 58,59; examples I,II *; | [X]US4570270 (OECHSLE III SIXTUS J [US]) [X] 1-14 * examples 3-5 *; | [X]EP0026915 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * examples 6A,6B,10A-D *; | [X]DE19732313 (IECEK CO [JP]) [X] 23 * example 11; claim 1 *; | [X]US4267299 (OECHSLE III SIXTUS J) [X] 23,27,28 * column 10, lines 2-6; example VIII * | Examination | - Römpp: Gelcoat, 30.10.13 | - wikipedia, deutsch: Gelcoat, 30.10.13 | - wikipedia, englisch: Gelcoat, 30.10.13 | by applicant | DE19729982 | US4695618 | US4570270 | EP0026915 | DE19732313 | US4267299 |