EP1505057 - METHOD OF PURIFYING QUATERNARY ALKYLAMMONIUM SALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/06] | METHOD OF PURIFYING QUATERNARY ALKYLAMMONIUM SALT AND QUATERNARY ALKYLAMMONIUM SALT | ||
[2011/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stella Chemifa Kabushiki Kaisha 6-3, Awajimachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541-0047 / JP | [2011/25] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Stella Chemifa Kabushiki Kaisha 6-3, Awajimachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541-0047 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUYAMA, Hirohisa, STELLA CHEMIFA KK 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 02 /
WAKI, Masahide, STELLA CHEMIFA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 03 /
HASHIGUCHI, Shinji, STELLA CHEMIFA KK 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 04 /
NISHIDA, Tetsuo, STELLA CHEMIFA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 05 /
TASHIRO, Yasutaka, STELLA CHEMIFA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 06 /
AOKI, Kenji, STELLA CHEMIFA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 41, Rinkaicho 1-chome Izumiootsu-shi, Osaka 595-0075 / JP | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03720921.0 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003JP04911 | Priority number, date | JP20020138918 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002138918 | [2005/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095414 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505057 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505057 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/84, C07C211/63 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
C07C209/84 (EP,KR,US);
C07C211/63 (KR);
H01G11/62 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M6/166 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/84, C07C211/63 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/06] | C07C209/84, C07C211/63, H01M10/40, H01G9/038 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON QUATERNÄREM ALKYLAMMONIUMSALZ | [2011/06] | English: | METHOD OF PURIFYING QUATERNARY ALKYLAMMONIUM SALT | [2011/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE SEL D'ALKYLAMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE | [2011/06] |
Former [2005/06] | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON QUATERNÄREM ALKYLAMMONIUMSALZ UND QUATERNÄRES ALKYLAMMONIUMSALZ | ||
Former [2005/06] | METHOD OF PURIFYING QUATERNARY ALKYLAMMONIUM SALT AND QUATERNARY ALKYLAMMONIUM SALT | ||
Former [2005/06] | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE SEL D'ALKYLAMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE ET SEL D'ALKYLAMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | Translation filed | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Request for further processing for: | 16.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2003 | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001106656 ; | [DA]WO0177063 (STELLA CHEMIFA KK [JP], et al) [DA] 1-20* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001106656 A 20010417 (MITSUBISHI CHEMICALS CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2002030044 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO); | [X]JP2002053532 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK); | [XE]JP2003137847 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) |