EP1511898 - DIFFUSER WASHER FOR CELLULOSE PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Fiber Karlstad AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | [2007/27] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states KVAERNER PULPING AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNEKKENES, Vidar Herrhagsgatan 62 S-652 19 KARLSTAD / SE | 02 /
EK, Bror Västbro 8050 S-661 93 SÄFFLE / SE | 03 /
GUSTAVSSON, Lennart Renvallsvägen 38 S-653 50 KARLSTAD / SE | 04 /
LANDMARK, Lars Klövervägen 11 S-665 34 KIL / SE | 05 /
JONSSON, Lennart Lilla Romstadsgatan 9 S-653 42 KARLSTAD / SE | [2005/10] | Application number, filing date | 03721224.8 | 23.04.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003SE00638 | Priority number, date | SE20020001307 | 26.04.2002 Original published format: SE 0201307 | [2005/10] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091495 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1511898 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/04 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
D21C9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFUSIONSWASCHANLAGE FÜR ZELLSTOFF | [2005/10] | English: | DIFFUSER WASHER FOR CELLULOSE PULP | [2005/10] | French: | LAVEUR PAR DIFFUSION DESTINE A DE LA PATE DE CELLULOSE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2003 | Translation filed | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 28.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9520067 ; | [A]EP0377427 |