EP1496738 - A DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR SAMPLING OF MILK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DeLaval Holding AB Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | [2005/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSMA, Epke Hökvägen 52 S-147 34 Tumba / SE | 02 /
HOLMERTZ, Nils, Erik Mangardsvägen 17 S-141 51 Huddinge / SE | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Gray, Helen Mary, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Gray, Helen Mary, et al Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Keijser Bergöö, Malin Katarina, et al DeLaval International AB Intellectual Property & Legal Support Box 39 147 21 Tumba / SE | ||
Former [2005/03] | Israelsson, Stefan Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03721232.1 | 23.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003SE00651 | Priority number, date | SE20020001215 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: SE 0201215 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090522 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496738 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496738 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/04, // G01N1/20 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
A01J5/01 (EP,US);
A01J5/0131 (EP,US);
A01J5/0132 (EP,US);
A01J5/045 (EP,US);
G01N2001/205 (EP,US);
G01N33/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | A01J5/04, // G01N1:20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTNAHME VON MILCHPROBEN | [2005/03] | English: | A DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR SAMPLING OF MILK | [2005/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ECHANTILLONNAGE DE LAIT | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA MAASSLUIS / NL Opponent's representative Jennen, Peter Leonardus Hendricus, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA MAASSLUIS / NL Opponent's representative Jennen, Peter Leonardus Hendricus, et al, et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely NV Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | 06.06.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.03.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/33] | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | BE | 04.07.2007 | CH | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | CZ | 04.07.2007 | EE | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | LI | 04.07.2007 | RO | 04.07.2007 | SI | 04.07.2007 | SK | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | BG | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | ES | 15.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | HU | 05.01.2008 | GB | 23.04.2008 | IE | 23.04.2008 | LU | 23.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
TR | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
HU | 05.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LU | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
HU | 05.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LU | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
GB | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
LU | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
GB | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
GB | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | SI | 04.07.2007 | |
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | SI | 04.07.2007 | |
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | SI | 04.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1773656 (TUCHENHAGEN OTTO); | [A]EP0098966 (SCHWARTE GMBH ALFONS [DE]); | [A]FR2645705 (SAE AFIKIM [IL]); | [X]WO9215196 (PA CONSULTING SERVICES [GB]); | [A]EP0564023 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]); | [A]EP0713641 (MAASLAND NV [NL]); | [A]SE515093 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) |