EP1504532 - HIGH PRECISION ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O2Micro, Inc. 3118 Patrick Henry Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Liusheng 3172 Neal Avenue, 4 San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 02 /
LI, Guoxing 910 W. Remington Drive, 7B Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Jungen, Rolf Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Jungen, Rolf Lippert, Stachow & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03721907.8 | 30.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US13166 | Priority number, date | US20020142503 | 10.05.2002 Original published format: US 142503 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03096541 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504532 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504532 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/12, H03M3/02 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
H03M3/34 (EP,US);
H03M3/43 (EP,US);
H03M3/456 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/06] | H03M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHPRÄZISER ANALOG/DIGITAL-UMSETZER | [2005/06] | English: | HIGH PRECISION ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER | [2005/06] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMERIQUE HAUTE PRECISION | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 17.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08166543.2 / EP2026468 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Request for further processing for: | 30.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | GB | 30.04.2009 | LU | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
GB | 30.04.2009 | ||
LU | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
GB | 30.04.2009 | ||
LU | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
GB | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
GB | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5323158 (FERGUSON JR PAUL F [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 1, line 6 - line 12 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 58 * [A] 7; | [A]US5495200 (KWAN TOM W [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7 * figure 2 ** column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 8 * | International search | [Y]US3810152 (WHITE J); | [A]US4764753 (YUKAWA AKIRA [JP]); | [A]US4939516 (EARLY ADRIAN B [US]); | [A]US5079550 (SOOCH NAVDEEP S [US], et al); | [A]US5189419 (LYDEN COLIN [IE]); | [A]US5229772 (HANLON MICHAEL M [US]); | [Y]US5408235 (DOYLE JAMES T [US], et al); | [A]US5495200 (KWAN TOM W [US], et al); | [A]US5894284 (GARRITY DOUGLAS A [US], et al); | [A]US5920275 (HESTER RICHARD K [US]); | [Y]US5959562 (WIESBAUER ANDREAS [AT]); | [A]US5982313 (BROOKS TODD L [US], et al); | [A]US6040793 (FERGUSON JR PAUL F [US], et al); | [Y]US6362761 (BONARDI FELICE [IT], et al); | [AP]US6400302 (AMAZEEN BRUCE EDWARD [US], et al); | [XP]US6437720 (YIN GUANGMING [US], et al); | [AP]US6509790 (YANG YUQING [US]) |