EP1540536 - METHOD FOR THE REAL-TIME DISTRIBUTION OF STREAMING DATA ON A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Yahoo! Inc. 701 First Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Hongyu 718 Old San Francisco Road, Apt 336 Sunnyvale, CA 84086 / US | 02 /
KEKRE, Amol 45288 South Grimmer Boulevard Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 03 /
BENNETT, Michael 1 Montague Place San Francisco, CA 94133 / US | [2005/45] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
YAO, Hongyu 2253 McLaughlin Avenue, Apt. 2 San Jose, CA 95122 / US | ||
02 /
KEKRE, Amol 45288 South Grimmer Boulevard Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
03 /
BENNETT, Michael 1 Montague Place San Francisco, CA 94133 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Palmer, Jonathan Richard, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03721911.0 | 25.04.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US13190 | Priority number, date | US20020132974 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: US 132974 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091915 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540536 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540536 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/18, H04N21/238, H04N21/24, H04N21/262, H04N21/61, H04N21/81, H04N21/488 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/238 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US);
H04L67/62 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/23805 (EP,US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
H04N21/26291 (EP,US);
H04N21/4886 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/8126 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2005/24] | G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEITVERTEILUNG VON STREAMING-DATEN AUF EINEM NETZWERK | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE REAL-TIME DISTRIBUTION OF STREAMING DATA ON A NETWORK | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION EN TEMPS REEL DE DONNEES EN CONTINU SUR UN RESEAU | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2003 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IE | 25.04.2016 | LU | 25.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.04.2003 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0221300 (XANBOO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * page 22 - page 28 * [I] 5,6,12-20; | [XI] - Pavan Deolasee et al., "Adaptive Push-Pull: Disseminating Dynamic Web Data", Hong Kong, WWW10, (20010505), pages 265 - 274, URL: http://www10.org/cdrom/papers/pdf/p269.pdf, (20101108), XP002608527 [X] 1-4,7-11 * page 265 - page 271 * [I] 5,6,12-20 | [I] - SRINIVASAN R ET AL, Maintaining temporal coherency of virtual data warehouses, REAL-TIME SYSTEMS SYMPOSIUM, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. THE 19TH IEEE MADRID, SPAIN 2-4 DEC. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/REAL.1998.739731, PAGE(S) 60 - 70, (19981202), pages 60 - 70, ISBN 978-0-8186-9212-3, XP010318777 [I] 1-20 * page 60 - page 64 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/REAL.1998.739731 | International search | [Y]US5675786 (MCKEE NEIL HOWARD [GB], et al); | [YP]US2003002608 (GLENN ROBERT C [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0221300 | - PAVAN DEOLASEE ET AL., ADAPTIVE PUSH-PULL: DISSEMINATING DYNAMIC WEB DATA, (20010505), pages 265 - 274 | - "Maintaining temporal coherency of virtual data warehouses", SRINIVASAN R ET AL., Real-Time Systems Symposium, IEEE COMPUTING SOCIETY, (19981202), pages 60 - 70 |