EP1488293 - ALARM AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SWITCH CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 32 D-42551 Velbert / DE | [2006/28] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states EMKA BESCHLAGTEILE GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 32 D-42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Rainer Pestalozzistrasse 37 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03722229.6 | 20.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003DE00928 | Priority number, date | DE2002204858U | 26.03.2002 Original published format: DE 20204858 U | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081356 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488293 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488293 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, E05B47/06 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G07C9/00944 (EP,US);
G07C9/00912 (EP,US);
H02B1/30 (EP);
H02B1/306 (EP);
Y10T70/625 (EP,US);
Y10T70/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGS- UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN SCHALTSCHRANK | [2004/52] | English: | ALARM AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SWITCH CABINET | [2004/52] | French: | SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE COMMANDE POUR ARMOIRE ELECTRIQUE | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 04.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.07.2006 | CZ | 12.07.2006 | EE | 12.07.2006 | FI | 12.07.2006 | IE | 12.07.2006 | RO | 12.07.2006 | SI | 12.07.2006 | SK | 12.07.2006 | TR | 12.07.2006 | BG | 12.10.2006 | DK | 12.10.2006 | SE | 12.10.2006 | GR | 13.10.2006 | PT | 12.12.2006 | HU | 13.01.2007 | AT | 20.03.2007 | LU | 20.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | CH | 31.03.2007 | LI | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 12.07.2006 | |
CZ | 12.07.2006 | ||
EE | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
AT | 20.03.2007 | ||
LU | 20.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
EE | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
AT | 20.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
AT | 20.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 12.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE20017057U (DIRAK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-9,12 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,6 * * page 5, paragraph 7 * * page 11 - page 13 * * figures 11-13 * * claims 14,16-18 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * [Y] 10,11; | [A]US2002022894 (ERYUREK EVREN [US], et al) [A] 12 * paragraph [0050] *; | [PA]WO0229186 (DIRAK GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * page 15, line L *; | [Y] - FROMBERGER J, "FELDBUSFAEHIGE, INTELLIGENTE SENSOREN", MESSEN UND PRUFEN, IVA INTERNATIONAL, MUNCHEN, DE, (19910801), vol. 27, no. 7 / 8, ISSN 0937-3446, pages 332,334 - 339, XP000262915 [Y] 10,11 * page 332 * * page 335, column L, line 18 - line 22 * | [A] - KUNTZ W ET AL, "INTELLIGENTE SENSOREN UND AKTOREN", ELEKTRONIK, FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, DE, (19910903), vol. 40, no. 18, ISSN 0013-5658, pages 58,61 - 65, XP000262261 [A] 1 * page 58, column L, paragraph 2 * | [A] - KRIESEL W ET AL, "ASI IM UEBERBLICK", AKTUATOR SENSOR INTERFACE FUER DIE AUTOMATION, XX, XX, (1994), pages 11 - 60, XP002062938 [A] 11 * page 14, paragraph 1 * * figure 1.3 * |