EP1492668 - ASSEMBLY OF LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | LAMINATED GLASS ASSEMBLY | ||
[2012/17] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Chaussée de la Hulpe 166 1170 Watermael-Boitsfort / BE | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Glaverbel Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPERDUTI, Sergio, Glaverbel - Centre R & D 2, rue de l'Aurore B-6040 Jumet / BE | 02 /
STROFFOLINO, Mario, Glaverbel - Centre R & D Rue de l'Aurore, 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Verbrugge, Vivien François Emeric, et al AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Verbrugge, Vivien François Emeric, et al AGC Glass Europe Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2009/45] | Verbrugge, Vivien François Emeric, et al AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Decamps, Alain René François, et al AGC Flat Glass Europe SA Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Le Vaguerèse, Sylvain Jacques, et al Glaverbel Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 03722437.5 | 09.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003EP03704 | Priority number, date | BE20020000251 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: BE 200200251 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084744 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492668 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP);
B32B17/10807 (EP);
B32B17/10862 (EP);
B32B17/10935 (EP);
B32B17/10981 (EP);
B32B17/1099 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENFÜGEN VON VERBUNDGLÄSERN | [2005/01] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF LAMINATED GLASS | [2012/17] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE VITRAGES FEUILLETES | [2005/01] |
Former [2005/01] | LAMINATED GLASS ASSEMBLY | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0811481 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 29 - line 33 *; | [A]FR2442122 (SAINT GOBAIN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 1 * | Examination | FR2622143 |