EP1500400 - DRUG CONTAINING ANTIBODY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIWA, Rinpei, c/o Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. 6-6, Asahimachi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 02 /
SHITARA, Kenya, c/o Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. 6-6, Asahimachi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03723097.6 | 09.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003JP04503 | Priority number, date | JP20020106949 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002106949 | [2005/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084569 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500400 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P9/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P31/14, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/04, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C12P21/08, C12N15/09, C12N5/10, C07K16/18 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/04] | A61K39/395, A61P9/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/04, A61P31/12, A61P31/14, A61P35/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/04, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, G01N33/15, // (C12P21/08, C12N15:09, 5:10, C07K16:18), C12P21:08, C12R1:91, C12N5:10, C12R1:91 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL MIT ANTIKÖRPER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/04] | English: | DRUG CONTAINING ANTIBODY COMPOSITION | [2005/04] | French: | MEDICAMENT CONTENANT UNE COMPOSITION ANTICORPS | [2005/04] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2004 | Translation filed | 09.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9954342 (UMANA PABLO [CH], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 11, line 9 - line 10 * * page 20, line 25 - page 25, line 11 * * example 3 * * claims 1,2,4,6,32-38,74-83 *; | [E]WO03035835 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [E] 1-19 * page 10, paragraph L - page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 16, paragraph 6 - page 35, paragraph 3 * * page 41, paragraph 1 - page 43, paragraph 4 * * page 52, paragraph 2 - page 54, paragraph 3 * * example 1 * * claims 1-24,32-35 *; | [L]WO03085107 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [L]WO03085119 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [L]WO03085102 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [L]WO03085118 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [E]EP1498485 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1498491 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1498490 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1500698 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A] - LIFELY M R (REPRINT) ET AL, "Glycosylation and biological-activity of CAMPATH-1H expressed in different cell-lines and grown under different culture conditions", GLYCOBIOLOGY, IRL PRESS,, GB, (199512), vol. 5, no. 8, ISSN 0959-6658, pages 813 - 822, XP002096118 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/glycob/5.8.813 | [A] - CLARK M R, "IGG EFFECTOR MECHANISMS", CHEMICAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 65, pages 88 - 110, XP001204090 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - GRABENHORST E ET AL, "GENETIC ENGINEERING OF RECOMBINANT GLYCOPROTEINS AND THE GLYCOSYLATION PATHWAY IN MAMMALIAN HOST CELLS", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL, LUND, SE, (199902), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0282-0080, pages 81 - 97, XP008005300 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1026466408042 | International search | [A]WO9727303 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP], et al); | [X]WO0061739 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al); | [XP]WO0231140 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A] - RIPKA J. ET AL., "Two Chinese hamster ovary glycosylation mutants affected in the conversion of GDP-mannose to GDP-fucose", ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1986), vol. 249, no. 2, pages 533 - 545, XP002971006 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(86)90031-7 | [X] - SHITARA K. ET AL., "A new vector for the high level expression of chimeric antibodies in myeloma cells", J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1994), vol. 167, no. 1-2, pages 271 - 278, XP002911931 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(94)90096-5 | [A] - DAVIES J. ET AL., "Expression of GnTIII in a recombinant anti-CD20 CHO production cell line: Expression of antibodies with altered glycoforms leads to an increase in ADCC through higher affinity for Fc gamma RIII", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2001), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 288 - 294, XP002964541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.1119 | [A] - HACKETT J. JR. ET AL., "Recombinant mouse-human chimeric antibodies as calibrators in immunoassays that measure antibodies to toxoplasma gondii", J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 1277 - 1284, XP002971007 | [A] - ELBASHIR S.M. ET AL., "Duplexes of 21-nucleotide RNAs mediate RNA interference in cultured mammalian cells", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, no. 6836, pages 494 - 498, XP002206451 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35078107 | [A] - SHIELDS R.L. ET AL., "High resolution mapping of the binding site on human IgG1 for Fc gamma RI, Fc gamma RII, Fc gamma RIII and FcRn and design of IgG1 variants with improced binding to the Fc gamma R", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, no. 9, pages 6591 - 6604, XP002971008 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M009483200 | [XP] - SHIELDS R.L. ET AL., "Lack of fucose on human IgG1 N-linked oligosaccharide improves binding to human Fc gamma RIII and antibody-.dependent cellular toxocity", J. BIOL. CHEM., (200207), vol. 277, no. 30, pages 26733 - 26740, XP002964542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202069200 | [XP] - SHINKAWA T. ET AL., "The absence of fucose but not the presence of galkactose or bisecting N-acetylglucosamine of human IgG1 complex-type oligosaccharides shows the critical role of enhancing antibody-dependent cellular cytotoxicity", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 3466 - 3473, XP002965857 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M210665200 |