EP1498750 - REFLECTION ELEMENT OF EXPOSURE LIGHT AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, MASK, EXPOSURE SYSTEM, AND PRODUCTION METHOD OF SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAWARA, Minoru c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03723149.5 | 18.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05000 | Priority number, date | JP20020118941 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002118941 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03089964 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498750 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, G02B5/08, G03F7/20 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
G02B5/0891 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/24 (KR);
G02B5/201 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/702 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70958 (EP,KR,US);
G21K1/062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | G02B5/26, G02B5/28, G02B5/08, G03F1/16, G03F7/20, H01L21/027, G21K1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | REFLEXIONSELEMENT FÜR BELICHTUNGSLICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, MASKE , BELICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2005/03] | English: | REFLECTION ELEMENT OF EXPOSURE LIGHT AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, MASK, EXPOSURE SYSTEM, AND PRODUCTION METHOD OF SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2005/03] | French: | ELEMENT DE REFLEXION DE LUMIERE D'EXPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION A CET EFFET, DE MASQUE, DE SYSTEME D'EXPOSITION, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2004 | Translation filed | 19.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 19.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6333961 (MURAKAMI KATSUHIKO [JP]); | [A]JP2001237174 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2001027699 (NIKON CORP) |