EP1499104 - INFORMATION RECORDING METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING TERMINAL, INFORMATION RECORDING SYSTEM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNG, Po-Chieh, Konica Tech. Center Corporation 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03723177.6 | 23.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05154 | Priority number, date | JP20020122490 | 24.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002122490 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004004311 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499104 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21, G06F12/00, G06F17/30, G11B27/00 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H04N1/00135 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
H04N1/00132 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSENDGERÄT, INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSSYSTEM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2005/03] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING TERMINAL, INFORMATION RECORDING SYSTEM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2005/03] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, TERMINAL D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTEME D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2004 | Translation filed | 19.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 27.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10136146 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]JPH10145542 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]JPH10145543 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [X]JPH11187176 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]JP2000098506 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2001339583 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [X]JP2002023278 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |