EP1498411 - DIKETOHYDRAZINE DERIVATIVE COMPOUNDS AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE COMPOUNDS AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [2013/03] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATAYAMA, Akira, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 02 /
TSURUTA, Hiroshi, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 03 /
OCHI, Yasuo, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 04 /
IMAWAKA, Haruo, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | 05 /
OHMOTO, Kazuyuki c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | [2012/51] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
HATAYAMA, Akira, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
TSURUTA, Hiroshi, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
OCHI, Yasuo, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
IMAWAKA, Haruo, c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | |||
05 /
OHMOTO, Kazuyuki c/o Ono Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1-1, Sakurai 3-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/03] |
Former [2005/03] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03723188.3 | 24.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05252 | Priority number, date | JP20020123796 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002123796 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091202 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498411 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498411 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1498411 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C243/24, C07C251/76, C07C251/84, C07C251/86, C07D207/22, C07D207/408, C07D207/50, C07D211/26, C07D213/53, C07D231/08, C07D233/32, C07D263/26, C07D275/02, C07D277/18, C07D307/52, C07D309/04, C07D309/06, C07D405/12, C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D487/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K31/351 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (EP,US);
A61K31/4035 (EP,US);
A61K31/4152 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K31/4168 (EP,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K31/423 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/429 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C243/34 (EP,US);
C07C251/76 (EP,US);
C07C251/84 (EP,US);
C07C251/86 (EP,US);
C07D207/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07D207/50 (EP,US);
C07D209/46 (EP,US);
C07D211/28 (EP,US);
C07D211/72 (EP,US);
C07D211/86 (EP,US);
C07D211/98 (EP,US);
C07D213/70 (EP,US);
C07D213/76 (EP,US);
C07D213/77 (EP,US);
C07D213/78 (EP,US);
C07D233/38 (EP,US);
C07D233/52 (EP,US);
C07D233/80 (EP,US);
C07D239/10 (EP,US);
C07D239/18 (EP,US);
C07D239/36 (EP,US);
C07D241/08 (EP,US);
C07D241/18 (EP,US);
C07D263/26 (EP,US);
C07D263/28 (EP,US);
C07D265/08 (EP,US);
C07D265/10 (EP,US);
C07D265/33 (EP,US);
C07D275/02 (EP,US);
C07D275/03 (EP,US);
C07D275/06 (EP,US);
C07D277/18 (EP,US);
C07D277/36 (EP,US);
C07D277/50 (EP,US);
C07D277/54 (EP,US);
C07D277/60 (EP,US);
C07D277/82 (EP,US);
C07D279/02 (EP,US);
C07D279/06 (EP,US);
C07D279/12 (EP,US);
C07D285/10 (EP,US);
C07D285/16 (EP,US);
C07D309/04 (EP,US);
C07D309/28 (EP,US);
C07D335/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D513/10 (EP,US);
C07F9/59 (EP,US);
C07F9/65583 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | DIKETOHYDRAZINDERIVATVERBINDUNGEN UND ARZNEIMITTEL, DIE DIE VERBINDUNGEN ALS WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTEN | [2005/03] | English: | DIKETOHYDRAZINE DERIVATIVE COMPOUNDS AND DRUGS CONTAINING THE COMPOUNDS AS THE ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2005/03] | French: | COMPOSES DERIVES DE DICETOHYDRAZINE ET MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT CES COMPOSES COMME INGREDIENT ACTIF | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2004 | Translation filed | 25.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 29.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | [2014/01] |
Former [2013/49] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BG | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9917775 (CEPHALON INC [US]) [AD] 1,5-10,12-18* page 1, line 10 - page 3, line 25; table 2, page 38, example 110 *; | [PX]WO03013518 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,5-18 * page 3, lines 25-32; page 7, lines 12-16; page 31, line 23 - page 34, line 25; example 28 * | International search | [A]WO9917775 (CEPHALON INC [US]); | [XP]WO03013518 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | - CROATIA CHEMICA ACTA, (1978), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 81 - 92 |