EP1622399 - LOCATION JUDGMENT METHOD USING CELL BROADCAST, MOBILE TERMINAL THEREOF, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | 17.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUWAHARA, Soichi; c/o FUJITSU NISHI-NIHON COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS LIMITED 2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 02 /
TACHIBANA, Yasunori c/o FUJITSU PERSONAL COMPUTER SYSTEMS LIMITED 1405, Oaza Oomaru Inagi-shi, Tokyo 206-0801 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Jun'ya c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
KISHI, Makoto; c/o FUJITSU NISHI-NIHON COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS LIMITED; 2-1, Momochihama 2-chome, Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03723262.6 | 08.05.2003 | [2006/05] | WO2003JP05770 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100579 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622399 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W76/40 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/33] |
Former [2006/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STANDORTBEURTEILUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON CELL BROADCAST, MOBILES ENDGERÄT DAVON UND PROGRAMM | [2006/05] | English: | LOCATION JUDGMENT METHOD USING CELL BROADCAST, MOBILE TERMINAL THEREOF, AND PROGRAM | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE D'ESTIMATION D'EMPLACEMENT UTILISANT UNE EMISSION CELLULAIRE, SON TERMINAL MOBILE ET PROGRAMME | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2005 | Translation filed | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 30.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05175899 (TAMURA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0874529 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 8 *; | [A]WO0217656 (ERICSSON INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1307060 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004054304 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0865736 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2000059843 (MICRO HERIOSU KK); | [A]JP2002223474 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002232933 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [X]JP2002344867 (FUJITSU LTD) |