EP1509450 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COLLECTING PARTICULATE SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JONES, John 11307 Paul Barwick Court San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03724390.4 | 02.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US13694 | Priority number, date | US20020160148 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 160148 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101834 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509450 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509450 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/04, G01N1/04, // A61J3/00 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
B01L3/0289 (EP,US);
G01N1/04 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0657 (EP,US);
G01N2001/1006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | B65B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFFANGEN VON TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN STOFFEN | [2005/09] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COLLECTING PARTICULATE SUBSTANCE | [2005/09] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE RECUEIL DE SUBSTANCE PARTICULAIRE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | IE | 02.05.2009 | LU | 02.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
IE | 02.05.2009 | ||
LU | 02.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.05.2009 | ||
LU | 02.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3957374 (KRIESE MANFRED, et al); | [A]JPS5610361 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] * abstract *; | [X]US5676643 (CANN DAVID V [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-20,35-40 * column 4, lines 15-29; figure - *; | [X]WO0022722 (DELSYS PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-7,12,19-23,25,27,29-31,35,36,38-42 * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 3 *; | [X]GB2345870 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,11,19-21,23,29,33-42 * pages 22-28; examples 3,4 *; | [X]US6287595 (LOEWY ZVI [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,11,12,19-23,29-31,33-36,38-42 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1a,11-22 * * column 5, lines 6-18 * * column 6, lines 38-58 * * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 7 * * column 9, line 30 - column 12, line 55 * * column 14, line 50 - column 15, line 5 * * column 18, line 66 - column 20, line 41 * | International search | [A]US5722017 (CARUTHERS JR EDWARD B [US], et al); | [A]US5855851 (MATSUBARA SHIGEKI [JP], et al); | [AP]US6551558 (MANN KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) |