EP1507750 - METHOD FOR PREPARING CERAMIC POWDERS IN THE PRESENCE OF A CARBON SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/08] | METHOD FOR PREPARING CERAMIC POWDERS IN THE PRESENCE OF A CARBON SOURCE, POWDERS OBTAINED AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2020/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [2021/17] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states HYDRO QUEBEC 75 Boulevard René Lévesque Ouest Montréal H2Z 1A4, Québec / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAGHIB, Karim 3672, Belcourt Longueuil, Québec J4M 2M7 / CA | 02 /
GUERFI, Abdelbast 8655, Boulevard Rivard Brossard, Québec J4X 1W2 / CA | 03 /
ARMAND, Michel 2965, Fendall Montréal, Québec H3T 1N2 / CA | 04 /
CHAREST, Patrick 1662, rue Calixa-Lavallée Sainte-Julie, Québec J3E 1P2 / CA | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2021/17] |
Former [2014/20] | Goulard, Sophie, et al Ipsilon Brema-Loyer Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | ||
Former [2005/08] | Sueur, Yvette Cabinet SUEUR et L'HELGOUALCH, 109, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03724742.6 | 27.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003CA00795 | Priority number, date | CA20022389555 | 30.05.2002 Original published format: CA 2389555 | [2005/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101909 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1507750 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1507750 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01G23/00, C01G25/00, B82Y30/00, C04B35/462, C04B35/622, C04B35/626, C04B35/628, C04B35/634, H01M8/1246, H01M10/052, H01M4/90, H01M4/1391, H01M4/485 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/62821 (US);
C01G23/005 (EP,US);
C01G25/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/462 (EP,US);
C04B35/505 (US);
C04B35/62204 (EP,US);
C04B35/6265 (EP,US);
C04B35/628 (EP,US);
C04B35/62823 (US);
C04B35/62839 (EP,US);
C04B35/63488 (EP,US);
C04B35/63496 (EP,US);
F02F3/0084 (US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/60 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3234 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3237 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M4/9025 (EP,US);
H01M8/1246 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | C04B35/462, C04B35/628, C04B35/634, C01G23/00, H01M4/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMISCHEN PULVERN IN ANWESENHEIT VON EINER KOHLENSTOFQUELLE | [2020/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING CERAMIC POWDERS IN THE PRESENCE OF A CARBON SOURCE | [2020/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POUDRES CERAMIQUES EN PRESENCE D'UNE SOURCE DE CARBONE | [2020/51] |
Former [2005/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMISCHEN PULVERN IN ANWESENHEIT VON EINER KOHLENSTOFQUELLE, DIE SO ERHALTENEN PULVER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2005/08] | METHOD FOR PREPARING CERAMIC POWDERS IN THE PRESENCE OF A CARBON SOURCE, POWDERS OBTAINED AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2005/08] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POUDRES CERAMIQUES EN PRESENCE D'UNE SOURCE DE CARBONE, POUDRES AINSI OBTENUES ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2003 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | ES | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | IT | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | TR | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 27.05.2003 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 27.05.2003 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
IT | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0227824 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,12,15,16,20,21,27,29,31,33,38,40,43,45,46,49,50,54,55 * page 5, lines 1-15 * * page 12, lines 25-29 * * page 16, lines 4-25 * * page 18, lines 1-6; examples 2,4,8,9 * [Y] 13; | [X]WO0153198 (VALENCE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9-12,15,16,20-23,27,29,31,33,36,38,40,45-47,49,54,55 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 19; examples 1-10 *; | [X]US6387568 (BARKER JEREMY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,12,15,16,27,29,31,33,36-38,45-47,49,54,55 * example 2 *; | [X]EP0157366 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,11,15,20,27,31-33,36,38-40,45,46,49,50,54-57,59,60 * page 1, lines 14-25 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 30 * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 9; example 8 * * page 27, lines 6-10; table 5 *; | [X]EP0313412 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-3,15,18,20,24,27,31,32,39,40,43-46,52-57,59,60 * page 3, lines 22-31; examples 6,11,18 *; | [X]JPH02180754 ; | [X]US5766796 (ABRAHAM KUZHIKALAIL M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15,20,25-27,31,32,39,40,43,45,46,52-55 * example 1 *; | [X]US6153336 (KIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 54 * example 3 *; | [X]EP0448302 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,2,15,20,27,28,31-33,50,54,55 * examples 8C,9 *; | [Y]EP1049182 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [Y] 13 * example 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901002), vol. 014, no. 456, Database accession no. (C - 0765), & JP02180754 A 19900713 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 54,56 * abstract * | Examination | US4741253 | US6207311 | - DR J STEIN AND AL, "Mechanofusion for high performance particles", PROCESS ENGINEERING, LONDON, GB, (20020101), vol. 79, no. 4, pages E11 - E15, XP002315531 | - 2 Max, "POWDER AND PARTICLE PROCESSING", hokosawa micron, (20200101), pages 1 - 10, URL: https://hosokawamicron.co.jp/en/download/confirm, (20200204), XP055664827 |