EP1494920 - METERING DEVICE FOR FLOWABLE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finnah Engineering und Packaging GmbH Einsteinstrasse 18 48683 Ahaus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Finnah Engineering und Packaging GMBH Einsteinstrasse 18 48683 Ahaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINGENHOFF, Berthold Veilchenweg 15 48683 Ahaus / DE | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Engelmann, Kristiana, et al Busse & Busse, Patentanwälte Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Engelmann, Kristiana, Dipl.-Ing., et al Busse & Busse, Patentanwälte, Grosshandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 03725041.2 | 16.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003EP03959 | Priority number, date | DE2002206064U | 18.04.2002 Original published format: DE 20206064 U | [2005/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03086864 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494920 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494920 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/32, B67C3/20 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
B65B3/32 (EP,US);
B65B39/12 (EP,US);
G01F11/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLIESSFÄHIGE PRODUKTE | [2006/17] | English: | METERING DEVICE FOR FLOWABLE PRODUCTS | [2005/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE PRODUITS COULANTS | [2005/02] |
Former [2005/02] | DOSIERVORRICHTUNG F R FLIESSF HIGE PRODUKTE | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | CZ | 13.09.2006 | EE | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | IE | 13.09.2006 | RO | 13.09.2006 | SI | 13.09.2006 | SK | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | BG | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | HU | 14.03.2007 | AT | 16.04.2007 | LU | 16.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2013/51] |
Former [2009/43] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
TR | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
HU | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 16.04.2007 | ||
LU | 16.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
CZ | 13.09.2006 | ||
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
AT | 16.04.2007 | ||
LU | 16.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
AT | 16.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
EE | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
AT | 16.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
RO | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SK | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
SI | 13.09.2006 | ||
BG | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2610396 (GE HALIN ABFUELLMASCHINENFABRI) [A] 6* page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 23; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3623417 (BENZ & HILGERS GMBH [DE]) [A] 2 * column 4, lines 58-66; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19918430 (MAIER STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0286785 |