EP1495256 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING LUBRICANT PROPERTIES BY MEANS OF DILUTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAYNE, Frank David Pool Lane, Ince Chester, Cheshire CH2 4NU / GB | [2005/02] | Application number, filing date | 03725075.0 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003EP04182 | Priority number, date | GB20020008880 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0208880 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03087650 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495256 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16N39/08, F01M5/04 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F01M9/02 (EP,US);
F16N39/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER SCHMIERSTOFFEIGENSCHAFTEN DURCH VERDÜNNUNG | [2005/02] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING LUBRICANT PROPERTIES BY MEANS OF DILUTING THE SAME | [2005/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DES PROPRIETES D'UN LUBRIFIANT GRACE A LA DILUTION DE CE DERNIER | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/18] | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE921239 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,13 * column 1, line 11 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]GB588712 (POWER JETS LTD, et al) [A] 1,13 * column 1 - column 2; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0571328 ; | [A]JPS57134098 ; | [A]JPS62294628 ; | [A]JPS62289533 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930722), vol. 017, no. 392, Database accession no. (M - 1450), & JP05071328 A 19930323 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821118), vol. 006, no. 232, Database accession no. (M - 172), & JP57134098 A 19820819 (IDEMITSU KOSAN KK) [A] 1,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880603), vol. 012, no. 191, Database accession no. (C - 501), & JP62294628 A 19871222 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [A] 4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880527), vol. 012, no. 181, Database accession no. (C - 499), & JP62289533 A 19871216 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO LTD) [A] 4 * abstract * |