EP1495528 - ALTERNATOR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2018/35] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94017 Creteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPRETRE, Laurent 11 rue de l'Abbé Bouly F-62360 Condette / FR | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2018/35] |
Former [2005/02] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André-Boulle, BP 150 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03725304.4 | 19.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003FR00865 | Priority number, date | FR20020003804 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203804 | [2005/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081750 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495528 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495528 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/173, F16C35/067 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
H02K5/1732 (EP);
H02K5/173 (KR);
F16C35/067 (EP,KR);
H02K5/16 (KR);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C2226/60 (EP);
F16C2380/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/35] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WECHSELSTROMGENERATOR FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2005/02] | English: | ALTERNATOR FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/02] | French: | ALTERNATEUR POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 28.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2003 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | GB | 19.03.2019 | IE | 19.03.2019 | LU | 19.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.03.2019 | ||
IE | 19.03.2019 | ||
LU | 19.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.03.2019 | ||
IE | 19.03.2019 | ||
LU | 19.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 19.03.2019 | ||
IE | 19.03.2019 | ||
LU | 19.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
GB | 19.03.2019 | ||
IE | 19.03.2019 | ||
LU | 19.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.03.2019 | ||
LU | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 29.08.2018 | |
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | ES | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2025153 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2377723 (DUCELLIER & CIE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE19957709 (SKF SVERIGE AB GOETEBORG [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]CH426387 (FRISCHKNECHT WERNER [CH]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6145199 (MALCHOW GREGORY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,7 *; | [A]US4094559 (SLUSARSKI RONALD S) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3469897 (RIKE HOWARD W) [A] 1 * figure - * |