EP1497453 - METHODS FOR MEASURING PROTEIN KINASE AND PHOSPHATASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare UK Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states GE Healthcare UK Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Amersham Biosciences UK Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHATELEY, John, Gerard Amersham Biosciences UK Ltd The Maynard Centre Forest Farm Estate Whitchurch Cardiff CF14 7YT / GB | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Franks, Barry Gerard, et al Amersham plc, Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03725332.5 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003GB01683 | Priority number, date | GB20020008987 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0208987 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03089665 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497453 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497453 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/42, C12Q1/48, G01N33/50 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
C12Q1/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN VON PROTEIN KINASE UND PHOSPHATASE AKTIVITÄT | [2005/03] | English: | METHODS FOR MEASURING PROTEIN KINASE AND PHOSPHATASE ACTIVITY | [2005/03] | French: | PROCEDES DE MESURE DE L'ACTIVITE DE LA PROTEINE KINASE ET DE LA PHOSPHATASE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9802571 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO0109372 (BAYER AG [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * abstract ** claim 4 *; | [A] - MCILROY B K ET AL, "A CONTINUOUS FLUORESCENCE ASSAY FOR PROTEIN KINASE C", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 195, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 148 - 152, XP002254376 [A] 1-45 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(91)90310-P |