EP1499007 - MOTOR DRIVING APPARATUS, MOTOR DRIVING METHOD, AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Masahiro, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
KIKUCHI, Masafumi, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
FUJINO, Akira, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
SHIBASAKI, Mitsuru, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Hitoshi, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
KAYAMA, Shun, SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2005/03] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03725623.7 | 22.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05106 | Priority number, date | JP20020118939 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002118939 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090340 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499007 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/41 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H02P6/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | MOTORANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG, MOTORANTRIEBSVERFAHREN UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2005/03] | English: | MOTOR DRIVING APPARATUS, MOTOR DRIVING METHOD, AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2005/03] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRAINEMENT A MOTEUR, PROCEDE D'ENTRAINEMENT A MOTEUR ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2004 | Translation filed | 28.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 26.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001178183 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2000069792 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2001095294 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2000232800 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH08186995 (SYST HOOMUZU KK); | [A]JPH01103194 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) |