EP1516328 - RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING DATA STRUCTURE FOR MANAGING REPRODUCTION OF VIDEO DATA RECORDED THEREON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UM, Soung Hyun 18-701, Samho Apt. Bisan-dong Dongan-gu 431-050 Anyang, Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
YOO, Jea Yong C-306, Maebong Samsung APT. Dogok-dong Kangnam-gu, 135-270 Seoul / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sung Wan 337-1403, Byuksan APT. Doogyun Maeul Jungja-dong Jangan-gu, 40-300 Suwon-si / KR | 04 /
SEO, Kang Soo 606-503, Chowon Hanyang Apt., 897-5, Pyoungan Dongan, 431-075 Anyang, Kyunggi-do / KR | 05 /
HYUN, Eun Sil B01 Chungwoon Villa, 419-36 Sadang-dong Dongjak-gu, 156-090 Seoul / KR | 06 /
KIM, Byung Jin 111-204, Hansol Chungu APT., 110 Jeongja-dong Bundang, 463-010 Sungnam, Kyunggi-do / KR | [2013/46] |
Former [2005/12] | 01 /
UM, Soung Hyun 18-701, Samho Apt., Bisan-dong, Dongan-gu 431-050 Anyang, Kyunggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
YOO, Jea Yong C-306, Maebong Samsung APT., Dogok-dong Kangnam-gu, 135-270 Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
PARK, Sung Wan 337-1403, Byuksan APT., Doogyun Maeul, Jungja-dong Jangan-gu, 40-300 Suwon-si / KR | |||
04 /
SEO, Kang Soo 606-503, Chowon Hanyang Apt., 897-5, Pyoungan Dongan, 431-075 Anyang, Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
HYUN, Eun Sil B01 Chungwoon Villa, 419-36, Sadang-dong Dongjak-gu, 156-090 Seoul / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Byung Jin 111-204, Hansol Chungu APT., 110, Jeongja-dong Bundang, 463-010 Sungnam, Kyunggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/12] | Schorr, Frank, Dr., et al Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03725840.7 | 23.05.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003KR01016 | Priority number, date | KR20020035009 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: KR 2002035009 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004001748 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1516328 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1516328 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/12] | G11B20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT EINER DATENSTRUKTUR ZUR VERWALTUNG DER REPRODUKTION VON DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEN VIDEODATEN | [2005/12] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING DATA STRUCTURE FOR MANAGING REPRODUCTION OF VIDEO DATA RECORDED THEREON | [2005/12] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT A STRUCTURE DE DONNEES PERMETTANT DE GERER LA LECTURE DE DONNEES VIDEO ENREGISTREES DESSUS | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 01.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2003 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | IT | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | GR | 14.02.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | IE | 23.05.2014 | LU | 23.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.05.2003 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.05.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1041569 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-32* the whole document *; | [X]EP1103974 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0029] - [0057]; figures 2-17 *; | [X]EP1198133 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0106] - [0189]; figure - * | International search | [Y]JP2000348442 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH1040667 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]JP2002150685 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2000235779 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2001169246 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH1032780 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) | by applicant | EP1103974 | EP1198133 |