EP1512083 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UPDATING CHATTING DATA IN AN INTERACTIVE DISC PLAYER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDRE, Limonov 103-109, Kolong Apt. Woomyun-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul 137-784 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Tae Ho 102, 121 Bunji yochang-dong Yongsan-gu, Seoul 140-120 / KR | 03 /
UM, Soung Hyun 18-701, Samho Apt. Bisan-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang, Kyunggi-do 431-050 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Jea Yong C-306, Maebong Samsung APT. Dogok-dong Kangnam-gu, Seoul 135-270 / KR | 05 /
YOON, Woo Seong 102-701, Geukdong Apt. Teogyewon-myun Namyangjoo-si, Kyonggi-do 472-744 / KR | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Schorr, Frank, Dr., et al Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03725853.0 | 30.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003KR01068 | Priority number, date | KR20020031807 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: KR 2002031807 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105018 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512083 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G11B27/002 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AKTUALISIEREN VON CHATTING-DATEN IN EINEM INTERAKTIVEN PLATTENABSPIELGERÄTENETZWERK | [2005/10] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR UPDATING CHATTING DATA IN AN INTERACTIVE DISC PLAYER NETWORK | [2005/10] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA MISE A JOUR DE DONNEES DE CONVERSATION EN LIGNE DANS UN RESEAU DE LECTURE DE DISQUE EN MODE INTERACTIF | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0063915 (SPRUCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** page 5, line 19 - line 24 *; | [X]US2001052028 (ROBERTS DALE TYSON [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 4, column L, paragraph 48 - page 4, column R, paragraph 56 * * abstract *; | [E]WO03096175 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20020007890 (LEE EUN SEOG [KR], et al); | [A]KR20010028563 (KIM HYE SUK [KR]); | [A]KR20020028438 (DREAMLINE CORP [KR]) |